Potter v. Bren

Case Number: 14-1379
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark (Federal Question)


We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
August 28, 2014 POTTER v. BREN
March 31, 2014 POTTER v. BREN
May 6, 2014 POTTER v. BREN
July 24, 2014 POTTER v. BREN

Search for this case: Potter v. Bren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?