Adkins v. US

Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES P. ADKINS and JANE E. ADKINS
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1356
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MODIFIED ENTRY: BRIEF FILED for Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Number of Pages: 24. Service: 03/04/2019 by email. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [590113] --[compliance review complete - Edited 03/05/2019 by SMJ] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:00 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 01/31/2019 by email. [582444] [19-1356] [Norah Bringer] [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:19 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Service: 01/30/2019 by email. [582112] [19-1356] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:03 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Service: 01/16/2019 by email. [578717] [19-1356] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:17 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins, Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/24/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[578671] [JAL] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:40 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Service: 01/07/2019 by email. [576393] [19-1356] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 7 ] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:10 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins, Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[576293] [MMA] [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:57 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Service: 01/04/2019 by email. [576026] [19-1356]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 01/04/2019 03:37 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for John F. Rodgers as principal counsel for Appellants Charles P. Adkins and Jane E. Adkins. Service: 01/04/2019 by email. [576024] [19-1356] [John Rodgers] [Entered: 01/04/2019 03:35 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Norah E. Bringer as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 01/03/2019 by email. [575764] [19-1356] [Norah Bringer] [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:44 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/20/2018. [575172] Entry of Appearance due 01/16/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/16/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/01/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 03/04/2019. [SMJ] [Entered: 01/02/2019 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES P. ADKINS
Represented By: John Franklin Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANE E. ADKINS
Represented By: John Franklin Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Norah Bringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?