Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Appellant: HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
Appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Case Number: 19-1494
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 7, 2020 HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. v. IANCU

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 17 ], ERROR: Appellant's motion [ # 17 ] did not contain a certificate of compliance with the word count. CORRECTION: For future motions, pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1), please include a certificate of compliance with the word count. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [594942] [JAL] [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:19 AM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Appellant's opening brief is due 07/12/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [594940] [JAL] [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:18 AM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION of Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. to extend the time to 07/12/2019 [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/22/2019 by email. [594928] [19-1494] [Constantine Trela] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:55 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 03/13/2019 by email. Appellant's brief is due 05/13/2019. [592563] [JAL] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:42 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/27/2019 by email. [589144] [19-1494] [Charles Verhoeven] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:53 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/27/2019 by email. [589143] [19-1494] [Charles Verhoeven] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:52 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Kevin P.B. Johnson as of counsel for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/27/2019 by email. [589142] [19-1494] [Charles Verhoeven] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:51 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Victoria F. Maroulis as of counsel for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/27/2019 by email. [589141] [19-1494] [Charles Verhoeven] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:50 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/27/2019 by email. [589140] [19-1494] [Charles Verhoeven] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:50 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to counsel for Appellee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement have not been filed. Please submit these documents promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [588593] [JAL] [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:54 AM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Michael J. Bettinger as of counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/15/2019 by email. [586471] [19-1494] [Michael Bettinger] [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:44 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Douglas I. Lewis as of counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/15/2019 by email. [586408] [19-1494] [Douglas Lewis] [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:39 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Ryan C. Morris as of counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586149] [19-1494] [Ryan Morris] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:51 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Curt Holbreich as of counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586148] [19-1494] [Curt Holbreich] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:49 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Nathaniel C. Love as of counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586147] [19-1494] [Nathaniel Love] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:47 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586144] [19-1494] [Constantine Trela] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:43 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586142] [19-1494] [Constantine Trela] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:41 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Constantine L. Trela, Jr. as principal counsel for Appellant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586136] [19-1494] [Constantine Trela] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:36 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/31/2019. [582626] Entry of Appearance due 02/15/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/15/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/15/2019. Certified List due on 03/13/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
Represented By: Constantine L. Trela Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger Esq.
Represented By: Ryan C. Morris
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Love
Represented By: Curt Holbreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria Fishman Maroulis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?