Amgen Inc. v. Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMGEN INC.
Defendant / Appellee: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, PIRAMAL HEALTHCARE UK LIMITED, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., CIPLA USA INC. and CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD., dba Zydus Cadila
Case Number: 19-1650
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 35 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [604211] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/30/2019 07:43 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Amgen Inc., Corrected Docketing Statement [ # 32 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[603991] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:40 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 33 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 29 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 30 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 31 ], ERROR: The amended entries of appearance for A. Russo [ # 29 ], J. Murnane [ # 30 ], and J. Rothman [ # 31 ] do not list all member cases of a consolidated group of appeals. CORRECTION: For future filings, please include all consolidated case numbers (19-1770) in addition to the lead case number (19-1650). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [603988] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:38 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 32 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [603955] [19-1650] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 34 ] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:08 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 31 Amended Entry of appearance for Joshua I. Rothman as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [603952] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:06 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 30 Amended Entry of appearance for John D. Murnane as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [603948] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:05 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 29 Amended Entry of appearance for Alicia A. Russo as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/30/2019 by email. [603947] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:04 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 Clerk's Note to the File: The entry of appearance, certificate of interest, and docketing statement for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Piramal Healthcare UK Limited, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharamceutical Industries, Ltd., and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. are due 05/13/2019. [603631] [JAL] [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:59 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 27 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1650 Lead with 19-1770 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [603618] [19-1650, 19-1770] [JAL] [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:49 PM]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER filed. The stay of Appeal No. 19-1650 is lifted, and it and Appeal No. 2019-1770 are consolidated. One set of briefs should be filed for the two appeals. Amgens opening brief is due no later than 60 days from the date of filing of this order. Service: 04/29/2019 by clerk. [603597] [19-1650, 19-1770] [NEL] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:39 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 Notice from Appellant Amgen Inc. regarding postjudgment motions. Service: 04/10/2019 by email. [599136] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/10/2019 07:45 PM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 This entry was made in error and has been removed from the docket. Notice to counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.: The record of this case indicates that the fee has not been paid for this case [ # 1 ]. Please pay the fee promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [596437] [JAL] [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:19 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596365] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:45 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596364] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:43 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596363] [19-1650] [Christopher Essig] [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:11 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/28/2019 by email. [596362] [19-1650] [Christopher Essig] [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:06 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 Entry of appearance for Steffen N. Johnson as of counsel for Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/19/2019 by email. [593990] [19-1650] [Steffen Johnson] [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:53 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 18 Entry of appearance for George C. Lombardi as principal counsel for Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/19/2019 by email. [593988] [19-1650] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:50 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 Entry of appearance for Zachary L. Sorman as of counsel for Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/19/2019 by email. [593985] [19-1650] [Zachary Sorman] [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:44 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 Entry of appearance for Christopher B. Essig as of counsel for Appellees Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Service: 03/19/2019 by email. [593982] [19-1650] [Christopher Essig] [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:41 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Lauren Cranford Katzeff as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/18/2019 by email. [593485] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:31 AM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 11 ], ERROR: The contact information on the entry of appearance for J. Rothman [ # 11 ] does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [593031] [JAL] [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:01 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 Notice from Appellant Amgen Inc. regarding postjudgment motions. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592971] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:53 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Alicia A. Russo as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592969] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:38 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Joshua I. Rothman as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592968] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:36 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for John D. Murnane as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592966] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:35 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Wendy A. Whiteford as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592963] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:27 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Lois M. Kwasigroch as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592961] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:23 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Eric M. Agovino as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592959] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:21 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Ryan C. Morris as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592958] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:16 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Joshua J. Fougere as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592957] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:12 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Sona De as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592956] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:10 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Bradford J. Badke as principal counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 03/14/2019 by email. [592955] [19-1650] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:08 PM]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed. Appeal No. 19-1650 is stayed pursuant to 02/01/2019 order in 18-2414 [ # 582816-2 ]. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [592863] [JAL] [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:28 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 02/01/2019. [592859] Fee/IFP due on 03/28/2019. Entry of Appearance due 03/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/28/2019. Docketing Statement due 03/28/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. v. Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMGEN INC.
Represented By: Alicia Alexandra Rose Russo
Represented By: John Dennis Murnane Esq.
Represented By: Lois M. Kwasigroch
Represented By: Joshua John Fougere
Represented By: Bradford J. Badke
Represented By: Wendy A. Whiteford
Represented By: Ryan C. Morris
Represented By: Joshua Rothman
Represented By: Sona De
Represented By: Lauren Cranford Katzeff
Represented By: Eric Michael Agovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: John W. Shaw Esq.
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Zachary L. Sorman Esq.
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Represented By: Steffen Nathanael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: John W. Shaw Esq.
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Zachary L. Sorman Esq.
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Represented By: Steffen Nathanael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK LLC
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PIRAMAL HEALTHCARE UK LIMITED
Represented By: Aaron Barkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: William Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA USA INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD., dba Zydus Cadila
Represented By: William Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?