Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. Aisin Seiki Co., Ltd.
Appellant: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC
Appellee: AISIN SEIKI COMPANY, LTD., TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION and AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.
Case Number: 19-1719
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/13/2019 by email. [606942] [JAL] [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:07 PM]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed. Appeal Nos. 19-1800 and 19-1801 are consolidated. The revised official caption for 19-1800 and 19-1801 is reflected in the order. The certified lists for the consolidated appeals are due no later that 06/04/19. The consolidated appeals and Appeal Nos. 19-1718 and 19-1719 shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [604682] [19-1718, 19-1719, 19-1800, 19-1801] [JAL] [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:34 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1718 Lead with 19-1719 Member. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [598186] [19-1718, 19-1719] [JAL] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:01 PM]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals (19-1718 and 19-1719). The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The certified lists are due no later than 05/13/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [598180] [19-1718, 19-1719] [JAL] [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:54 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/29/2019. [597076] Entry of Appearance is due 04/16/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/16/2019. Docketing Statement is due 04/16/2019. Certified List is due on 05/13/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. Aisin Seiki Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC
Represented By: John R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AISIN SEIKI COMPANY, LTD.
Represented By: Robert Carter Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert Carter Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.
Represented By: Robert Carter Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?