Siemens Mobility, Inc. v. Westinghouse Air Brake

Appellee: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Appellant: SIEMENS MOBILITY, INC.
Case Number: 19-1752
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [608393] [TAM] [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:39 AM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1732 (Lead) with 19-1752 (Member Case). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [601514] [19-1732, 19-1752] [TAM] [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:24 AM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER consolidating appeals (19-1732 with 19-1752). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [601510] [19-1732, 19-1752] [TAM] [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:18 AM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Benjamin E. Weed as of counsel for Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601441] [19-1752] [Benjamin Weed] [Entered: 04/18/2019 05:08 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Erik J. Halverson as of counsel for Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601434] [19-1752] [Erik Halverson] [Entered: 04/18/2019 05:01 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Jason A. Engel as of counsel for Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601428] [19-1752] [Jason Engel] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:55 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Devon C. Beane as of counsel for Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601424] [19-1752] [Devon Beane] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:51 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601421] [19-1752] [Alan Barry] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:47 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601420] [19-1752] [Alan Barry] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:45 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Alan L. Barry as principal counsel for Appellee Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. Service: 04/18/2019 by email. [601419] [19-1752] [Alan Barry] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:42 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/05/2019. [599064] Entry of Appearance due 04/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/24/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/24/2019. Certified List due on 05/20/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siemens Mobility, Inc. v. Westinghouse Air Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: Jason Alexander Engel
Represented By: Erik Halverson
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Weed
Represented By: Alan L. Barry
Represented By: Devon C. Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SIEMENS MOBILITY, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Sanok Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?