Shure Incorporated v. ClearOne, Inc.

Appellant: SHURE INCORPORATED
Appellee: CLEARONE, INC.
Case Number: 19-1755
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. Appellant's brief is due 07/22/2019. [609351] [TAM] [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:59 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], ERROR: The contact information included on the Entry of Appearance for Robert Hart does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 47.3(c)(1), please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the Entry of Appearance and in the user account matches. Please update ECF account information at www.pacer.gov. [603164] [TAM] [Entered: 04/26/2019 10:57 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602783] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:45 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602780] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:40 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602779] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:38 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602778] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:35 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Shure Incorporated, Entry of Appearance for Meredith M. Addy. Robert Hart and Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[602693] [TAM] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:35 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Matthew C. Phillips as principal counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602583] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:58 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Derek Meeker as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602580] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:56 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Kevin B. Laurence as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602578] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:54 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602575] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:52 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602574] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:50 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602398] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:10 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602397] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:07 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602396] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:03 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/08/2019. [599162] Entry of Appearance due 04/25/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/25/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/25/2019. Certified List due on 05/21/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/11/2019 08:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shure Incorporated v. ClearOne, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHURE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Thomas J. Campbell Jr.
Represented By: Meredith Martin Addy
Represented By: Robert Patrick Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLEARONE, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Carmine Phillips
Represented By: Matthew C. Phillips
Represented By: Kevin Brent Laurence
Represented By: Derek Meeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?