C R Bard Inc. v. AngioDynamics, Inc.

Plaintiff: C R BARD INC.
Defendant / Appellee: ANGIODYNAMICS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Case Number: 19-1756
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1756 (Lead) with 19-1934 (Member Case). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [610982] [19-1756, 19-1934] [TAM] [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:55 PM]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed. The motion [ # 15 ] is granted. The appeals are consolidated. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. One set of briefs should be filed for the appeals. Appellants' opening brief is due no later than July 29, 2019. Service: 06/03/2019 by clerk. [610969] [19-1756, 19-1934] [LS] [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:12 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION of Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. to consolidate appeals (19-1756 and 19-1934) [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610492] [19-1756] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:32 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for John T. Moehringer as of counsel for Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603050] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:55 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Michael J. Sebba as of counsel for Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603049] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:54 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Michael B. Powell as of counsel for Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603048] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:52 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Christopher A. Hughes as of counsel for Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603047] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:51 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603046] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:49 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603045] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:47 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Danielle Vincenti Tully as principal counsel for Appellee AngioDynamics, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [603043] [19-1756] [Danielle Tully] [Entered: 04/25/2019 05:46 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Vincent J. Belusko as of counsel for Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602882] [19-1756] [Vincent Belusko] [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:19 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Seth W. Lloyd as of counsel for Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602857] [19-1756] [Seth Lloyd] [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:39 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui as of counsel for Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602851] [19-1756] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:31 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602850] [19-1756] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:29 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602848] [19-1756] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:27 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard as principal counsel for Appellant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [602847] [19-1756] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:26 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/05/2019. [599180] Entry of Appearance due 04/25/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/25/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/25/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/10/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C R Bard Inc. v. AngioDynamics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C R BARD INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGIODYNAMICS, INC.
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: John Moehringer
Represented By: Danielle Vincenti Tully Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Sebba
Represented By: Michael Brian Powell
Represented By: Christopher A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.
Represented By: John G. Day Esq.
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Belusko
Represented By: Seth W. Lloyd
Represented By: Brian Robert Matsui
Represented By: Deanne Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?