Amgen Inc. v. Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. and WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., CIPLA LIMITED, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PIRAMAL HEALTHCARE UK LIMITED, SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., CIPLA USA INC. and CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD., dba Zydus Cadila
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMGEN INC.
Case Number: 19-1770
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Amgen Inc., Docketing Statement, Entries of Appearance - A. Russo, J. Murnane, J. Rothman [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due in 19-1650 by 05/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[603853] [JAL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 08:46 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Joshua I. Rothman as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603788] [19-1770] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:50 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for John D. Murnane as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603787] [19-1770] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:49 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Alicia A. Russo as of counsel for Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603785] [19-1770] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:48 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Amgen Inc.. Service: 04/29/2019 by email. [603782] [19-1770] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Bradford Badke] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:46 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1650 Lead with 19-1770 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [603618] [19-1650, 19-1770] [JAL] [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:49 PM]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed. The stay of Appeal No. 19-1650 is lifted, and it and Appeal No. 2019-1770 are consolidated. One set of briefs should be filed for the two appeals. Amgens opening brief is due no later than 60 days from the date of filing of this order. Service: 04/29/2019 by clerk. [603597] [19-1650, 19-1770] [NEL] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:39 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/10/2019. [600160] Entry of Appearance is due 04/29/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/29/2019. Docketing Statement is due 04/29/2019. Appellant's brief is due 06/14/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. v. Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK LLC
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: David E. Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PIRAMAL HEALTHCARE UK LIMITED
Represented By: Aaron Barkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: William Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIPLA USA INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD., dba Zydus Cadila
Represented By: William Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMGEN INC.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: George C. Lombardi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?