Apple Inc. v. US
Plaintiff / Appellant: APPLE INC.
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-1869
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Entry of appearance for Paula S. Smith as of counsel for Appellee US. Service: 07/08/2019 by email. [619616] [19-1869] [Paula Smith] [Entered: 07/08/2019 04:47 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Entry of appearance for Craig A. Lewis as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/28/2019 by email. [617769] [19-1869] [Craig Lewis] [Entered: 06/28/2019 12:39 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Amended Docketing Statement for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/18/2019 by email. [615258] [19-1869] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:48 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [613899] [19-1869] [Beverly Farrell] [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:57 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 06/13/2019 by email. [613821] [19-1869] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:43 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 7 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 4 ], ERROR: documents are not text-searchable. CORRECTION: future submissions to the court must be made in a text-searchable format. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [609889] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:52 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Beverly A. Farrell as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609884] [19-1869] [Beverly Farrell] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:46 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/26/2019 by email. [609703] [19-1869] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/26/2019 12:29 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for James E. Ransdell IV as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609674] [19-1869] [James Ransdell] [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:28 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for David P. Sanders as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609671] [19-1869] [James Ransdell] [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:25 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609654] [19-1869] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:52 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Michael J. West as of counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609492] [19-1869] [Michael West] [Entered: 05/24/2019 09:17 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Catherine E. Stetson as principal counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 05/24/2019 by email. [609490] [19-1869] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/24/2019 09:15 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/10/2019. [607091] Entry of Appearance due 05/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/28/2019. Docketing Statement due 06/13/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 07/15/2019. [SMJ] [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: James Edward Ransdell Esq. IV
Represented By: David Phillips Sanders Esq.
Represented By: Michael West
Represented By: Craig Anderson Lewis
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Beverly A. Farrell
Represented By: Paula S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?