Babcock v. US
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL ROBERT BABCOCK
Case Number: 19-1870
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice from Appellant Michael Robert Babcock entitled 'Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons'. Service: 05/29/2019 by clerk. [610078] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:33 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice from Appellant Michael Robert Babcock of intent to file formal brief. Brief due 07/15/2019. Service: 05/20/2019 by US mail. [609855] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:09 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Michael Babcock as pro se Appellant. Service: 05/28/2019 by clerk. [609849] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:02 PM]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 2 ] filed by Appellant Michael Robert Babcock. Service: 05/22/2019 by clerk. [608966] [LS] [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:54 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION of Appellant Michael Robert Babcock for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 05/14/2019 by clerk. [607178] [SMJ] [Entered: 05/14/2019 01:22 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/10/2019. [607176] Fee/IFP due on 05/28/2019. Entry of Appearance due 05/28/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 06/04/2019. [SMJ] [Entered: 05/14/2019 01:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Sheer
Represented By: Director, Tax Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL ROBERT BABCOCK
Represented By: Michael Robert Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?