Pfizer Inc. v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.

Appellant: PFIZER INC.
Appellee: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Case Number: 19-1871
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 Certified list received. Service: 06/24/2019 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [616740] [19-1871, 19-1873, 19-1875, 19-1876] [MMA] [Entered: 06/25/2019 12:27 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Arlene L. Chow as of counsel for Appellee Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Service: 05/29/2019 by email. [610066] [19-1871] [Arlene Chow] [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:13 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609936] [19-1871] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/28/2019 06:22 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609934] [19-1871] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/28/2019 06:18 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Elizabeth K. Chang as of counsel for Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609815] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:03 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Pan C. Lee as of counsel for Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609811] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:58 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Eric Alan Krause as of counsel for Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609809] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:56 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Dimitrios Drivas as of counsel for Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609807] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:54 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for John Scheibeler as principal counsel for Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609805] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:52 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609803] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:50 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Pfizer Inc.. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609800] [19-1871] [John Scheibeler] [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:39 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Thomas P. Schmidt as of counsel for Appellee Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608851] [19-1871] [Thomas Schmidt] [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:43 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Catherine E. Stetson as principal counsel for Appellee Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608847] [19-1871] [Catherine Stetson] [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:31 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-1871 (Lead) with 19-1873, -1875, -1876 (Member Cases). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [608790] [19-1871, 19-1873, 19-1875, 19-1876] [MMA] [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:55 PM]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals (19-1871 with 19-1873, -1875, -1876). The certified lists are due 06/24/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [608789] [19-1871, 19-1873, 19-1875, 19-1876] [MMA] [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:53 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/13/2019. [607195] Entry of Appearance due 05/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/28/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/28/2019. Certified List due on 06/24/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: John P. Scheibeler
Represented By: Pan C. Lee
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Chang
Represented By: Eric Alan Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: Arlene L. Chow
Represented By: Thomas Schmidt
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?