Sealy Technology, LLC v. Simmons Bedding Company
Appellant: SEALY TECHNOLOGY, LLC
Appellee: SIMMONS BEDDING COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1874
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certified list received. Service: 06/24/2019 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [616490] [TAM] [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:02 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for N. Dean Powell, Jr. as of counsel for Appellant Sealy Technology, LLC. Service: 06/01/2019 by email. [610840] [19-1874] [N. Powell] [Entered: 06/01/2019 09:32 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Sealy Technology, LLC. Service: 06/01/2019 by email. [610839] [19-1874] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 06/01/2019 09:30 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Sealy Technology, LLC. Service: 06/01/2019 by email. [610838] [19-1874] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 06/01/2019 09:28 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Steven D. Moore as principal counsel for Appellant Sealy Technology, LLC. Service: 06/01/2019 by email. [610837] [19-1874] [Steven Moore] [Entered: 06/01/2019 09:24 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to counsel for Appellant Sealy Technology, LLC: The record of this case indicates that the Certificate of Interest has not been filed. A completed certificate of Interest must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 by 05/31/2019. Additionally, an Entry of Appearance for lead counsel and the Docketing Statement have not been filed. These documents must be filed promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [610279] [TAM] [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:29 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Simmons Bedding Company. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609943] [19-1874] [Jon Baughman] [Entered: 05/28/2019 06:31 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Simmons Bedding Company. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609942] [19-1874] [Jon Baughman] [Entered: 05/28/2019 06:30 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for J. Steven Baughman as principal counsel for Appellee Simmons Bedding Company. Service: 05/28/2019 by email. [609940] [19-1874] [Jon Baughman] [Entered: 05/28/2019 06:28 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Note to file: 19-1874 (COMPANION started 05/23/2019) with 19-1872. These cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel for oral argument. [609309] [19-1872, 19-1874] [TAM] [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:26 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/10/2019. [607201] Entry of Appearance due 05/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/28/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/28/2019. Certified List due on 06/24/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sealy Technology, LLC v. Simmons Bedding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SEALY TECHNOLOGY, LLC
Represented By: N. Dean Powell
Represented By: Steven Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIMMONS BEDDING COMPANY
Represented By: Jon Steven Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?