James v. j2 Cloud Services, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: GREGORY C. JAMES
Defendant / Appellee: ADVANCED MESSAGING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and J2 CLOUD SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 19-2016
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 33 FILED from Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. Title: CORRECTED RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 12/17/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [657273] [19-2016] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:57 PM]
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC, Response Brief [ # 29 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant brief due on 12/19/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [656252] [MMA] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:30 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 31 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 30 ] filed by Appellant Gregory C. James. The reply brief is due 01/17/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [655395] [MMA] [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:09 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Gregory C. James to extend the time to 01/17/2020 to file the reply brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 12/02/2019 by email. [653290]--[Edited 12/03/2019 by MJL to correct relief] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 12/02/2019 04:18 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 29 FILED from Appellees j2 Cloud Services, LLC and Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 11/21/2019 by email. [651517] [19-2016] This brief is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 32 ] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:07 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 27 ] filed by Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. The response brief is due 11/21/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [647401] [MMA] [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:06 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION of Appellees j2 Cloud Services, LLC and Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. to extend the time to 11/21/2019 to file the Responsive Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/31/2019 by email. [646180] [19-2016] [Bassil Madanat] [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:25 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 24 ], ERROR: Appellees' motion does not include a certificate of compliance. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1), motions must contain a certificate of compliance with the word count. Please ensure future motions include the certificate of compliance. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [636429] [MMA] [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:02 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 25 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 24 ] filed by Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. The response brief is due 11/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [636427] [MMA] [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:00 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION of Appellees j2 Cloud Services, LLC and Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. to extend the time to 11/07/2019 to file the Responsive Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635837] [19-2016] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:21 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief [ # 22 ] received from Appellant Gregory C. James. [635106] [CJF] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:05 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant Gregory C. James. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 09/04/2019 by email. [633089]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:29 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Gregory C. James, Corrected Opening Brief [ # 20 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant brief is due 09/09/2019. Appellees' brief is due 10/08/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [632479] [MMA] [Entered: 08/30/2019 04:22 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 FILED from Appellant Gregory C. James. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/29/2019 by email. [632103] [19-2016] This brief is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 21 ] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:59 PM]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER filed. Appellant's motion [ # 17 ] is granted to the extent that the corrected opening brief is due 08/29/2019. The response brief is due within forty days of service of Appellant's corrected opening brief. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [630222] [MMA] [Entered: 08/22/2019 12:16 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 FILED from Appellant Gregory C. James. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/16/2019 by email. [628989] [19-2016] This brief is non-compliant. See ORDER [ # 19 ]. [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:33 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION of Appellant Gregory C. James to extend the time to 09/12/2019 to N/A to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 08/12/2019 by email. [627653] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:38 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellant Gregory C. James to Doc No. [ # 15 ]. Service: 08/12/2019 by email. [627621] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:37 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Gregory C. James indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 08/12/2019 by email. [627596] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:45 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. Service: 07/02/2019 by email. [618595] [19-2016] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:55 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [618538] [MMA] [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:13 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Entry of appearance for Daniel A. Kadin as of counsel for Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. Service: 06/27/2019 by email. [617592] [19-2016] [Daniel Kadin] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:50 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Entry of appearance for Bassil G. Madanat as of counsel for Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. Service: 06/27/2019 by email. [617589] [19-2016] [Bassil Madanat] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. and j2 Cloud Services, LLC. Service: 06/27/2019 by email. [617588] [19-2016] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:39 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for Appellees j2 Cloud Services, LLC and Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. Service: 06/27/2019 by email. [617586] [19-2016] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 13 ] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:36 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Guy Ruttenberg as principal counsel for Appellees j2 Cloud Services, LLC and Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/27/2019 by email. [617574] [19-2016] [Guy Ruttenberg] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:29 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 6 ], ERROR: Appellant's certificate of interest (COI) does not appear to be different than the previously filed COI. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 47.4(c), the COI should only be filed again if the required information changes. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [616536] [MMA] [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:56 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Gregory C. James. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616165] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:51 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Daniel C. Cotman as of counsel for Appellant Gregory C. James. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616164] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:51 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Gregory C. James. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616163] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:50 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Obi I. Iloputaife as principal counsel for Appellant Gregory C. James. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616161] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:49 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Gregory C. James. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616159] [19-2016] [Obi Iloputaife] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:47 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 06/11/2019. [613822] Entry of Appearance due 06/27/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/27/2019. Docketing Statement due 06/27/2019. Appellant's brief is due 08/12/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. j2 Cloud Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY C. JAMES
Represented By: Obi Iloputaife
Represented By: Daniel Charles Cotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANCED MESSAGING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Bassil George Madanat
Represented By: Daniel A. Kadin Esq.
Represented By: Guy Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J2 CLOUD SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Bassil George Madanat
Represented By: Daniel A. Kadin Esq.
Represented By: Guy Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?