Gilberti v. Federal Reserve System
Defendant / Appellee: LUIS RIVERA II TRUSTEE, MOFFIT CANCER CENTERS, SARASOTA COUNTY, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, Board of Governors, PEACE RIVER MANASOTA REGIONAL WATER SUPPLY AUTHORITY, MITCH MCCONNELL, in his capacity as Majority Leader of the U.S. Senate, SOUTHWEST FLORIDA WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT, FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, MOSAIC FERTILIZER, INC., 72 PARTNERS, LLC, NANCY PELOSI, In her capacity for the U.S. House of Representatives, BARACK OBAMA, MOSAIC COMPANY, HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY STATE ATTORNEYS OFFICE, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION and DESOTO COUNTY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH D. GILBERTI, JR., an Individual and Licensed Professional Engineer
Case Number: 19-2044
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE of Appellees EPA, Federal Reserve System, FEMA, Interior and United States Army Corps of Engineers to the court order [ # 3 ] , court order [ # 3 ] , court order [ # 3 ]. Service: 08/13/2019 by US mail, email. [627885] [19-2044] [Joshua Kurland] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:59 AM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE of Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District to the court order to show cause [ # 3 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 3 ] , court order [ # 3 ]. Service: 08/13/2019 by email, US mail. [627858] [19-2044] [Christopher Tumminia] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:04 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE of Appellant Joseph D. Gilberti, Jr. to the court order to show cause [ # 3 ] ,court order to stay appeal [ # 3 ] ,court order [ # 3 ]. Service: 08/13/2019 by clerk. [627935] [MMA] [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:31 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION of Appellant Joseph D. Gilberti, Jr. to stay appeal [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 08/09/2019 by clerk. [627332] [JAL] [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:32 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Appellant Joseph D. Gilberti, Jr. (Proof of Services to Racketeering and Related Cases). Service: 08/09/2019 by clerk. [627175] [JAL] [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:01 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Luis Rivera II Trustee. Service: 08/02/2019 by US mail, email. [625502] [19-2044] [Marie Tomassi] [Entered: 08/02/2019 08:28 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Luis Rivera II Trustee, Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 08/08/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [625268] [JAL] [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:04 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [625267] [JAL] [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:03 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Luis Rivera II Trustee. Service: 08/01/2019 by US mail, email. [625222] [19-2044] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 13 ] [Marie Tomassi] [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:23 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Entry of appearance for Marie Tomassi as principal counsel for Appellee Luis Rivera II Trustee. Service: 08/01/2019 by US mail, email. [625219] [19-2044] [Marie Tomassi] [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:19 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Entry of appearance for Joshua E. Kurland as principal counsel for Appellees EPA, Federal Reserve System, FEMA, Interior and United States Army Corps of Engineers. Service: 07/26/2019 by email, US mail. [623826] [19-2044] [Joshua Kurland] [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:30 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District. Service: 07/24/2019 by email, US mail. [623124] [19-2044] [Christopher Tumminia] [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:21 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected Entry of appearance for Christopher Tumminia as principal counsel for Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District. Service: 07/24/2019 by email, US mail. [623122] [19-2044] [Christopher Tumminia] [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:20 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District, Entry of Appearance - C. Tumminia and Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 07/30/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [622813] [JAL] [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:48 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District. Service: 07/22/2019 by email, US mail. [622446] [19-2044] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [Christopher Tumminia] [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:06 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Christopher Tumminia as principal counsel for Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District. Service: 07/22/2019 by email, US mail. [622441] [19-2044] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [Christopher Tumminia] [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:04 AM]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed. Within 30 days from the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to show cause as to whether this appeal should be transferred or dismissed. The briefing schedule is stayed. (Per Curiam). Service: 07/15/2019 by clerk. [621099] [NEL] [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:34 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to counsel for Appellees 72 Partners, LLC, Interior, Desoto County, EPA, FEMA, Federal Reserve System, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Hillsborough County State Attorneys Office, Luis Rivera II Trustee, Mitch McConnell, Moffit Cancer Centers, Mosaic Company, Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc., Barack Obama, Peace River Manasota Regional Water Supply Authority, Nancy Pelosi, Sarasota County, Southwest Florida Water Management District and United States Army Corps of Engineers: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest have not been filed. Completed documents must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 and 47.4 by 07/10/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [619742] [JAL] [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:12 AM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 06/14/2019. [615098] Entry of Appearance is due 07/02/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/02/2019. Appellant's Informal brief is due 07/09/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilberti v. Federal Reserve System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS RIVERA II TRUSTEE
Represented By: Marie Tomassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOFFIT CANCER CENTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARASOTA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Joshua E. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Joshua E. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Joshua E. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, Board of Governors
Represented By: Joshua E. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PEACE RIVER MANASOTA REGIONAL WATER SUPPLY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Clifford J. Zatz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MITCH MCCONNELL, in his capacity as Majority Leader of the U.S. Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTHWEST FLORIDA WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Represented By: Christopher Tumminia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Represented By: Joshua E. Kurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOSAIC FERTILIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 72 PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY PELOSI, In her capacity for the U.S. House of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARACK OBAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOSAIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY STATE ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DESOTO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH D. GILBERTI, JR., an Individual and Licensed Professional Engineer
Represented By: Joseph D. Gilberti Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?