Huang v. Nephos Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: XIAOHUA HUANG
Defendant / Appellee: NEPHOS INC.
Case Number: 19-2273
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER lifting the stay of the briefing schedule; granting motion to terminate appeal [ # 4 ]. The appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction.; denying as moot motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 8 ]; denying as moot motion for other relief [ # 14 ]; Each side shall bear its own costs.; ISSUED AS A MANDATE: October 11, 2019. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [641763] [NL] [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:13 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 09/11/2019 by email, US mail. [634689] [19-2273] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:23 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 09/04/2019 by email, US mail. [633042] [19-2273] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:36 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Xiaohua Huang, Certificate of Interest [ # 11 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [632587] [SJ] [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:21 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Xiaohua Huang, Docketing Statement [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [632579] [SJ] [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:15 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION of Appellant Xiaohua Huang entitled 'Motion to File Petition for a Writ of Mandamus' [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 09/05/2019 by clerk. [633489] [SJ] [Entered: 09/05/2019 04:48 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected Entry of appearance for John M. Hintz as principal counsel for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 08/29/2019 by email, US mail. [632118] [19-2273] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 08/29/2019 05:42 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corrected Entry of appearance for Brandon Stroy as of counsel for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 08/29/2019 by email, US mail. [632117] [19-2273] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 08/29/2019 05:40 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Nephos Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 09/06/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [631972] [SJ] [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:03 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION of Appellee Nephos Inc. to terminate appeal through Dismissal due to Lack of Jurisdiction. Cases to be terminated: 19-2273. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 08/28/2019 by email, US mail. [631788] [19-2273] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 08/28/2019 09:11 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for John M. Hintz as principal counsel for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 08/28/2019 by email, US mail. [631787] [19-2273] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 08/28/2019 09:01 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Brandon Stroy as of counsel for Appellee Nephos Inc.. Service: 08/28/2019 by email, US mail. [631786] [19-2273] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [Brandon Stroy] [Entered: 08/28/2019 08:48 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 09/03/2019 by clerk. [632584] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 12 ] [SJ] [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:19 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 09/03/2019 by clerk. [632577] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 10 ] [SJ] [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:13 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION of Appellant Xiaohua Huang for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 09/03/2019 by clerk. [632575] [SJ] [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:09 AM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/09/2019. [628195] Fee/IFP due on 08/28/2019. Entry of Appearance due 08/28/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/28/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 09/09/2019. [SJ] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Nephos Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: XIAOHUA HUANG
Represented By: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEPHOS INC.
Represented By: John Hintz
Represented By: Brandon H. Stroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?