Sharifi v. US
Plaintiff / Appellant: TEMOR S. SHARIFI
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-2382
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to counsel for Appellant Temor S. Sharifi: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement have not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [644745]--[Edited 10/25/2019 by JAL to amend docket text] [JAL] [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:13 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [644139] [JAL] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:31 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 6 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 7 ], ERROR: The electronic signatures on the entry of appearance and docketing statement [ # 6 ] [ # 7 ] did not comply with the court's signature format as described in FCR 25(d). CORRECTION: For future filings, all electronic signatures should follow the format "/s/" followed by the name of the person whose log-in information is used to submit the document. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [643254] [JAL] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:34 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643172] [19-2382] [John Smeltzer] [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:41 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for John L. Smeltzer as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643171] [19-2382] [John Smeltzer] [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:39 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to counsel for Appellee US: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance has not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [641250] [JAL] [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:10 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to counsel for Appellant Temor S. Sharifi: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest have not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [641249] [JAL] [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:09 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to counsel for Appellee US: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance has not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [639315] [JAL] [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:21 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to counsel for Appellant Temor S. Sharifi: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest have not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [639313] [JAL] [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:21 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/09/2019. [634252] Entry of Appearance is due 09/24/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/24/2019. Docketing Statement is due 10/10/2019. Appellant's brief is due 11/12/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharifi v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TEMOR S. SHARIFI
Represented By: Carolyn L. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Edward Carlos Thomas
Represented By: Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?