James-Cornelius v. HHS
Petitioner / Appellant: STACEY JAMES-CORNELIUS, on behalf of her minor child, E. J.
Respondent / Appellee: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 19-2404
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 FILED from Appellant Stacey James-Cornelius. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/14/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [649484] [19-2404] [Andrew Downing] [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:52 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [645516] [JAL] [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:11 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellee HHS. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640014] [19-2404] [Amy Kokot] [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:32 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Stacey James-Cornelius. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639351] [19-2404] [Andrew Downing] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:56 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Stacey James-Cornelius. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639350] [19-2404] [Andrew Downing] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:55 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Entry of appearance for Andrew D. Downing as principal counsel for Appellant Stacey James-Cornelius. Service: 10/01/2019 by email. [639348] [19-2404] [Andrew Downing] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:54 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of appearance for Amy P. Kokot as principal counsel for Appellee HHS. Service: 09/20/2019 by email. [637017] [19-2404] [Amy Kokot] [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:15 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Certified list received. Service: 09/18/2019 by clerk. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [636345] [JAL] [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:18 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/16/2019. [635973] Entry of Appearance is due 10/01/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/01/2019. Docketing Statement is due 10/17/2019. Certified List is due on 10/28/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James-Cornelius v. HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: STACEY JAMES-CORNELIUS, on behalf of her minor child, E. J.
Represented By: Andrew Downing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Amy Paula Kokot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?