Walby v. US
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHARON M. WALBY
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 19-2406
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 7 ] filed by Appellee US. No further extensions should be anticipated. The informal response brief is due 12/20/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [649155] [JAL] [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:10 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION of Appellee US to extend the time to 12/20/2019 to 31-days to file the United States, appellee answering brief. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 11/07/2019 by email, US mail. [647738] [19-2406] [Nathaniel Pollock] [Entered: 11/07/2019 01:04 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of appearance for Nathaniel S. Pollock as principal counsel for Appellee US. Service: 10/22/2019 by email, US mail. [643743] [19-2406] [Nathaniel Pollock] [Entered: 10/22/2019 10:22 AM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to counsel for Appellee US: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance has not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [643605] [JAL] [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:44 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to counsel for Appellee US: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance has not been filed. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [641489] [JAL] [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:39 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 3 paper copies of the Informal Opening Brief with Appendix [ # 3 ] received from Appellant Sharon M. Walby. [648144] [JCP] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:58 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX for Appellant Sharon M. Walby. Number of Pages: 28. Service: 10/10/2019 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [641488] [JAL] [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:39 AM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for as pro se for Appellant Sharon M. Walby. Service: 10/08/2019 by clerk. [641140] [JAL] [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:02 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/17/2019. [636333] Entry of Appearance is due 10/02/2019. Appellant's Informal brief is due 10/15/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 09/18/2019 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walby v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON M. WALBY
Represented By: Sharon M. Walby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Nathaniel Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?