Cephalon, Inc. v. Slayback Pharma Limited
Defendant: SLAYBACK PHARMA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellee: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, EAGLE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and CEPHALON, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: APOTEX CORP., MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC and APOTEX INC.
Case Number: 20-2134
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 15 ] filed by Appellants Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp., Mylan Laboratories Limited and Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. The opening briefs are due 11/04/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [722040] [KMH] [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:38 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION of Appellants Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC and Mylan Laboratories Limited to extend the time to 11/04/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721373] [20-2134] [Imron Aly] [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:09 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected Entry of appearance for Steven Eric Feldman; Sherry L. Rollo; Daniel R. Cherry; John D. Cravero as counsel for Appellants Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.. Service: 08/25/2020 by clerk. [717444] [20-2134] [Sherry Rollo] [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:11 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 20-2134 Lead with 20-2136 and 20-2137 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [716966] [20-2134, 20-2136, 20-2137] [KMH] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:37 PM]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER consolidating appeals 20-2134, 20-2136, and 20-2137. Appellants' opening briefs are due no later than October 5, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [716929] [20-2134, 20-2136, 20-2137] [KMH] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:44 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/28/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [716437] [KMH] [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:37 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716253] [20-2134] [Sherry Rollo] [Entered: 08/20/2020 03:19 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for Appellants Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716251] [20-2134] [Sherry Rollo] [Entered: 08/20/2020 03:18 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Entry of appearance for Steven Eric Feldman; Sherry L. Rollo; Daniel R. Cherry; John D. Cravero as counsel for Appellants Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716250] [20-2134] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 11 ] [Sherry Rollo] [Entered: 08/20/2020 03:17 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716229] [20-2134] [Daniel Brown] [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:53 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interest for Appellee Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716225] [20-2134] [Daniel Brown] [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:51 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Entry of appearance for Daniel G. Brown; Marc N. Zubick; Kenneth G. Schuler; Gabriel K. Bell as counsel for Appellee Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716223] [20-2134] [Daniel Brown] [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:48 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716143] [20-2134] [Ben Picozzi] [Entered: 08/20/2020 12:39 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716142] [20-2134] [Ben Picozzi] [Entered: 08/20/2020 12:37 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for David I. Berl; Adam D. Harber; Shaun P. Mahaffy; Ben Picozzi; Matthew W. Lachman as counsel for Appellees Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Service: 08/20/2020 by email. [716141] [20-2134] [Ben Picozzi] [Entered: 08/20/2020 12:35 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 08/04/2020. [713019] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/20/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/20/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/20/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 10/05/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 08/06/2020 12:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cephalon, Inc. v. Slayback Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: John W. Shaw Esq.
Represented By: David I. Berl Esq.
Represented By: Ben Picozzi
Represented By: Shaun Patrick Mahaffy
Represented By: Adam Harber
Represented By: Matthew Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EAGLE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: John W. Shaw Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Brown
Represented By: Kenneth G. Schuler
Represented By: Marc Nathan Zubick
Represented By: Gabriel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CEPHALON, INC.
Represented By: John W. Shaw Esq.
Represented By: David I. Berl Esq.
Represented By: Ben Picozzi
Represented By: Shaun Patrick Mahaffy
Represented By: Adam Harber
Represented By: Matthew Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLAYBACK PHARMA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Represented By: Sherry Lee Rollo
Represented By: John Cravero
Represented By: Steven Eric Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Ronald Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED
Represented By: Dennis Donald Gregory
Represented By: Nicole W. Stafford
Represented By: Aden M. Allen Esq.
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Nelson
Represented By: Imron T. Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: APOTEX INC.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Represented By: Sherry Lee Rollo
Represented By: John Cravero
Represented By: Steven Eric Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Ronald Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?