Anderson v. US
Plaintiff: JAVIER SANCHEZ, DOE NO. 3, LOVIE LEE STANLEY and VALENTINA SANCHEZ
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHERRY DIANE BRANDON HOLLOMAN, JUNIOR MORGAN, APALA D. WILSON, CHARLES E. WILSON, MARIA ROSA MENDOZA, DORIS J. KING, ERIC J. POWERS, DAVID SMITH, GEORGE ANDERSON, KATIE G. WRIGHT, DINNA ANNETTA PATTON, CHRISTOPHER DONAL, Estes et ux, MICHAEL PATTON, W S SPEARMAN, REGINA HOLLEMAN, TANYA RENEE RIGSBY, nka Tanya Graves, EUNICE JACKSON, ADELE MARY GADLIN, GINA GAIL MOSLEY, TERESA MAYS, AUDREY BABLES, ROBERT MOORE KING, LESTER MCDOWELL, RALPH DAVID HOLLOMAN, MICHAEL HOLLEMAN, ESTATE OF JUSTO & CLAR BELTRAN and LYDIA C. WEAVER
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 21-1445
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants Adele Mary Gadlin, George Anderson, Audrey Bables, Christopher Donal, Estate of Justo & Clar Beltran, Michael Holleman, Regina Holleman, Ralph David Holloman, Sherry Diane Brandon Holloman, Eunice Jackson, Doris J. King, Robert Moore King, Teresa Mays, Lester McDowell, Maria Rosa Mendoza, Junior Morgan, Gina Gail Mosley, Dinna Annetta Patton, Michael Patton, Eric J. Powers, Tanya Renee Rigsby, David Smith, W S Spearman, Lydia C. Weaver, Apala D. Wilson, Charles E. Wilson and Katie G. Wright. Service: 01/28/2021 by email. [752454] [21-1445] [John Sears] [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:17 PM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants George Anderson et al., Docketing Statement [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/04/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [752256] [LMN] [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:51 AM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Docketing Statement for the Appellants George Anderson, Audrey Bables, Christopher Donal, Estate of Justo & Clar Beltran, Adele Mary Gadlin, Michael Holleman, Regina Holleman, Ralph David Holloman, Sherry Diane Brandon Holloman, Eunice Jackson, Doris J. King, Robert Moore King, Teresa Mays, Lester McDowell, Maria Rosa Mendoza, Junior Morgan, Gina Gail Mosley, Dinna Annetta Patton, Michael Patton, Eric J. Powers, Tanya Renee Rigsby, David Smith, W S Spearman, Lydia C. Weaver, Apala D. Wilson, Charles E. Wilson and Katie G. Wright. Service: 01/21/2021 by email. [750674] [21-1445] "This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ] [John Sears] [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:54 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellants George Anderson, Audrey Bables, Christopher Donal, Estate of Justo & Clar Beltran, Adele Mary Gadlin, Michael Holleman, Regina Holleman, Ralph David Holloman, Sherry Diane Brandon Holloman, Eunice Jackson, Doris J. King, Robert Moore King, Teresa Mays, Lester McDowell, Maria Rosa Mendoza, Junior Morgan, Gina Gail Mosley, Dinna Annetta Patton, Michael Patton, Eric J. Powers, Tanya Renee Rigsby, David Smith, W S Spearman, Lydia C. Weaver, Apala D. Wilson, Charles E. Wilson and Katie G. Wright. Service: 01/05/2021 by email. [747040] [21-1445] [John Sears] [Entered: 01/05/2021 03:41 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for J. Robert Sears as counsel for Appellants George Anderson, Audrey Bables, Christopher Donal, Estate of Justo & Clar Beltran, Adele Mary Gadlin, Michael Holleman, Regina Holleman, Ralph David Holloman, Sherry Diane Brandon Holloman, Eunice Jackson, Doris J. King, Robert Moore King, Teresa Mays, Lester McDowell, Maria Rosa Mendoza, Junior Morgan, Gina Gail Mosley, Dinna Annetta Patton, Michael Patton, Eric J. Powers, Tanya Renee Rigsby, David Smith, W S Spearman, Lydia C. Weaver, Apala D. Wilson, Charles E. Wilson and Katie G. Wright. Service: 01/05/2021 by email. [747034] [21-1445] [John Sears] [Entered: 01/05/2021 03:34 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 11/04/2020. [744687] Entry of Appearance is due on 01/05/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/05/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 01/21/2021. Appellants' brief is due on 02/22/2021. [CAB] [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anderson v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHERRY DIANE BRANDON HOLLOMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUNIOR MORGAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APALA D. WILSON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES E. WILSON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA ROSA MENDOZA
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DORIS J. KING
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC J. POWERS
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SMITH
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE ANDERSON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATIE G. WRIGHT
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DINNA ANNETTA PATTON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER DONAL, Estes et ux
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL PATTON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: W S SPEARMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REGINA HOLLEMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TANYA RENEE RIGSBY, nka Tanya Graves
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EUNICE JACKSON
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADELE MARY GADLIN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GINA GAIL MOSLEY
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERESA MAYS
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUDREY BABLES
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT MOORE KING
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESTER MCDOWELL
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RALPH DAVID HOLLOMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL HOLLEMAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF JUSTO & CLAR BELTRAN
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYDIA C. WEAVER
Represented By: John Robert Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOE NO. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVIE LEE STANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALENTINA SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Lucinda J. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?