Uniloc USA, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNILOC LUXEMBOURG S.A. and UNILOC USA, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: APPLE INC.
Case Number: 21-1572
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTE TO FILE: FOR PRIOR ENTRIES SEE 20-1568 (See 02/25/2021 Order [ # 4 ]). [762878] [CAB] [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:08 AM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 7 ] filed by Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The opening brief is due 05/25/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [762132] [EKD] [Entered: 03/15/2021 09:53 AM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION of Appellants Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc. to extend the time to 05/25/2021 to file brief. Service: 03/12/2021 by email. [761990] [21-1572] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 03/12/2021 03:54 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellants Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc.. Service: 03/12/2021 by email. [761984] [21-1572] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 03/12/2021 03:49 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 21-1498, 21-1555, and 21-1572. [758682] [21-1498, 21-1555, 21-1572] [EKD] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:21 PM]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed granting motion to deconsolidate appeal [ # 755783-2 ] filed by Appellants. Appeal No. 2021-1572 is deconsolidated from Appeal Nos. 2021-1568, -1569, -1570, -1571, -1573. The revised separate captions are reflected above. The respective opening briefs in Appeal No. 2021-1572 and in Appeal Nos. 2021-1568 et al. are due no later than March 26, 2021. Appeal No. 2021-1572 shall be treated as a companion case to Appeal Nos. 2021-1498 et al. and Appeal No. 2021-1555. Appeal Nos. 2021-1568 et al. will no longer be treated as a companion case to Appeal Nos. 2021-1498 et al. and Appeal No. 2021-1555. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [758650] [21-1568, 21-1572, 21-1498, 21-1555] [LMS] [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:27 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1568 Lead with 21-1569, 21-1570, 21-1571, 21-1572, and 21-1573 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [753096] [21-1568, 21-1569, 21-1570, 21-1571, 21-1572, 21-1573] [EKD] [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:21 PM]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER consolidating appeals 21-1568, 21-1569, 21-1570, 21-1571, 21-1572, and 21-1573. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The official caption has been revised to reflect the consolidation of the appeals and to include the Electronic Frontier Foundation. Appellants' opening brief is due no later than March 26, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [753090] [21-1568, 21-1569, 21-1570, 21-1571, 21-1572, 21-1573] [EKD] [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:17 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 01/22/2021. [751492] Entry of Appearance is due on 02/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/08/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 02/08/2021. Appellants' brief is due on 03/26/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 01/25/2021 01:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNILOC LUXEMBOURG S.A.
Represented By: Aaron Jacobs Esq.
Represented By: Jordan Rice
Represented By: Lucas M. Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Sirolly Esq.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNILOC USA, INC.
Represented By: Aaron Jacobs Esq.
Represented By: Jordan Rice
Represented By: Lucas M. Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Sirolly Esq.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Alan Ernst Littmann Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Sprankling
Represented By: Mark D. Selwyn
Represented By: David P. Yin
Represented By: Catherine Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?