Carrum Technologies, LLC v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: CARRUM TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC and BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG
Case Number: 24-1480
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Qst.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 24-1183 lead, with 24-1480 member. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [989092] [24-1183, 24-1480] [GWK] [Entered: 03/07/2024 01:46 PM]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Carrum's motions [ # 987883-2 ] [ # 12 ] are granted. The appeals are consolidated, and one set of briefs should be filed for both appeals. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than 04/15/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [989029] [24-1183, 24-1480] [NL] [Entered: 03/07/2024 11:01 AM]
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION of Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC to consolidate appeals (24-1183; 24-1480). Service: 03/01/2024 by email. [987885] [24-1480] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 03/01/2024 04:39 PM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 Docketing Statement for the Appellees Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC and BMW of North America, LLC. Service: 02/28/2024 by email. [987279] [24-1480] [Lionel Lavenue] [Entered: 02/28/2024 02:51 PM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellees Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC and BMW of North America, LLC. Service: 02/28/2024 by email. [987276] [24-1480] [Lionel Lavenue] [Entered: 02/28/2024 02:48 PM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interest for Appellees Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC and BMW of North America, LLC. Service: 02/28/2024 by email. [987272] [24-1480] [Lionel Lavenue] [Entered: 02/28/2024 02:45 PM]
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 Entry of Appearance for Lionel M. Lavenue; Kara A. Specht; Joseph M. Myles; Forrest A. Jones; Deanna Smiley; David Lefcowitz as counsel for Appellees Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC and BMW of North America, LLC. Service: 02/28/2024 by email. [987268] [24-1480] [Lionel Lavenue] [Entered: 02/28/2024 02:41 PM]
February 16, 2024 Filing 7 Corrected Entry of Appearance for John M. Hughes; Andrew C. Baak; Mark L. Levine; Rebecca T. Horwitz; Taylor J.S. Kelson as counsel for Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC. Service: 02/16/2024 by email. [984622] [24-1480] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 02/16/2024 02:26 PM]
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC, Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 02/26/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [984583] [IMH] [Entered: 02/16/2024 01:21 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 Docketing Statement for the Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC. Service: 02/15/2024 by email. [984305] [24-1480] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 02/15/2024 05:54 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC. Service: 02/15/2024 by email. [984301] [24-1480] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 02/15/2024 05:51 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC. Service: 02/15/2024 by email. [984298] [24-1480] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 02/15/2024 05:45 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance for John M. Hughes; Andrew C. Baak; Mark L. Levine; Rebecca T. Horwitz; Taylor J.S. Kelson as counsel for Appellant Carrum Technologies, LLC. Service: 02/15/2024 by email. [984297] [24-1480] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 6 ] [Taylor Kelson] [Entered: 02/15/2024 05:43 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 02/08/2024. [984144] Entry of Appearance is due on 02/29/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/29/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 02/29/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 04/15/2024. [GWK] [Entered: 02/15/2024 12:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carrum Technologies, LLC v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRUM TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: John Hughes
Represented By: Andrew Baak
Represented By: Rebecca Horwitz
Represented By: Taylor James Kelson
Represented By: Mark Leslie Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell Esq. III
Represented By: Lionel M. Lavenue
Represented By: Forrest Alexander Jones
Represented By: David Lefcowitz
Represented By: Joseph M. Myles
Represented By: Deanna Smiley
Represented By: Kara Allyse Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW MANUFACTURING CO., LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell Esq. III
Represented By: Lionel M. Lavenue
Represented By: Forrest Alexander Jones
Represented By: David Lefcowitz
Represented By: Joseph M. Myles
Represented By: Deanna Smiley
Represented By: Kara Allyse Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell Esq. III
Represented By: Lionel M. Lavenue
Represented By: Forrest Alexander Jones
Represented By: David Lefcowitz
Represented By: Joseph M. Myles
Represented By: Deanna Smiley
Represented By: Kara Allyse Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?