Realtek Semiconductor Corporation v. ITC
Appellant: REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellee: INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Case Number: 24-1613
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 1, 2024 REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION v. ITC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION of Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and ATI Technologies ULC for leave to intervene. Service: 03/29/2024 by email. [993994] [24-1613] [Michael Renaud] [Entered: 03/29/2024 08:07 PM]
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Related Case Information for Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.; ATI Technologies ULC. Service: 03/29/2024 by email. [993993] [24-1613] [Michael Renaud] [Entered: 03/29/2024 07:57 PM]
March 29, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Interest for Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and ATI Technologies ULC. Service: 03/29/2024 by email. [993992] [24-1613] [Michael Renaud] [Entered: 03/29/2024 07:55 PM]
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 Entry of Appearance for Michael T. Renaud; Adam S. Rizk; Matthew A. Karambelas; Nana Liu as counsel for Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.; ATI Technologies ULC. Service: 03/29/2024 by email. [993991] [24-1613] [Michael Renaud] [Entered: 03/29/2024 07:52 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation, Entry of Appearance [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 04/04/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [993710] [IMH] [Entered: 03/28/2024 04:54 PM]
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Any opposition to Realtek's motion for a stay and interim stay [ # 2 ] is due no later than 04/12/2024. Any argument regarding the pending Commission proceedings should be made in a response to the motion. Any reply in support is due no later than 04/19/2024. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [993705] [NL] [Entered: 03/28/2024 04:36 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. Service: 03/28/2024 by email. [993626] [24-1613] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 03/28/2024 01:49 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Interest for Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. Service: 03/28/2024 by email. [993625] [24-1613] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 03/28/2024 01:47 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance for Mark S. Davies; Christopher J. Higgins; Lauren A. Weber; Emily W. Villano; Robert J. Benson; Jordan L. Coyle; Steve S. Baik; Jeffrey L. Johnson as counsel for Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation. Service: 03/28/2024 by email. [993623] [24-1613] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 03/28/2024 01:45 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Appellee ITC regarding Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Interim Stay. Service: 03/28/2024 by email. [993560] [24-1613] [Richard Hadorn] [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:20 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 Entry of Appearance for Richard P. Hadorn; Wayne W. Herrington; Houda Morad as counsel for Appellee ITC. Service: 03/28/2024 by email. [993551] [24-1613] [Richard Hadorn] [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:10 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Confidential MOTION of Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18 corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 03/27/2024 by email, US mail. [993522] [ALK] [Entered: 03/28/2024 09:35 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION of Appellant Realtek Semiconductor Corporation for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18. Service: 03/27/2024 by email, US mail. [993519] [ALK] [Entered: 03/28/2024 09:33 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/27/2024. [993517] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/11/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/11/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 04/29/2024. Certified List is due on 05/07/2024. [ALK] [Entered: 03/28/2024 09:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Realtek Semiconductor Corporation v. ITC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark S. Davies Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Richard P. Hadorn
Represented By: Wayne W. Herrington
Represented By: Houda Morad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?