Barron v. US
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MYERS, THE RPB REVOCABLE TRUST, CHRISTOPHER WORMWOOD, JAMES MUSSELWHITE, ANNA MARY WEAVER, ROMAN P. BOSWELL, Trustee of the RPB Revocable Trust, dated August 31, 2004, ENOS WEAVER, JR., DEBORAH E. BARRON, RONALD NOURSE, ALEXANDRINE L. BOSWELL, Trustee of the ALB Revocable Trust, dated July 21, 2003, JONATHAN ACHILLE, STEPHEN STILLER, THE ALB REVOCABLE TRUST, JACEK GATKIEWICZ, JAMES MYERS, OLD FOREST LAKES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, SHARON KRUEGER, JUNE SHUMWAY, JOHN BUENAVENTURA BAEZ, ALTA MARTIN, GILDA PASCUAL, COURTYARD VILLAS, L.L.C., THE MALLON FAMILY TRUST, JAMES ACHILLE, WILLIS MARTIN, HANNA GATKIEWICZ, JONATHAN LESTER, ANAPAULA V. LESTER, DANIEL J. MALLON and IRENE A. MALLON, as Trustees of the Mallon Family Trust under agreement dated October 3, 2007
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 25-1179
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Taking - Rails to Trails
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 16 RESPONSE of Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr., Christopher Wormwood and Not Parties Alexandrine L. Boswell, Roman P. Boswell, Hanna Gatkiewicz, Jacek Gatkiewicz, Anapaula V. Lester, Jonathan Lester, Daniel J. Mallon and Irene A. Mallon to Doc. No. [ # 15 ], [ # 15 ]. Service: 01/08/2025 by email. [1059395] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 01/08/2025 12:36 PM]
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellants; The opening brief is due 02/28/2025. Within seven days of the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to inform the court whether the caption for this appeal should be revised. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1058812] [LMS] [Entered: 01/06/2025 10:22 AM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interest for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 12/23/2024 by email. [1056586] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:21 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION of Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood to extend the time to 12/23/2024 to file brief. Service: 12/23/2024 by email. [1056585] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:20 PM]
December 16, 2024 Filing 12 Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 12/16/2024 by email. [1054299] [25-1179] [Kyle Glynn] [Entered: 12/16/2024 08:18 AM]
November 29, 2024 Filing 11 Entry of Appearance for Kyle Glynn as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 11/29/2024 by email. [1050642] [25-1179] [Kyle Glynn] [Entered: 11/29/2024 09:12 AM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/25/2024 by email. [1049800] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/25/2024 03:32 PM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 9 Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/25/2024 by email. [1049794] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/25/2024 03:29 PM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 8 Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/25/2024 by email. [1049792] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/25/2024 03:28 PM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 7 Corrected Entry of Appearance for Mark F. (Thor) Hearne, II as counsel for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/25/2024 by email. [1049791] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/25/2024 03:27 PM]
November 25, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood, Entry of Appearance, Docketing Statement, Certificate of Interest, Notice of Related Case Information [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 12/04/2024. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1049696] [GWK] [Entered: 11/25/2024 01:04 PM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case Information for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/22/2024 by email. [1049483] [25-1179] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 6 ] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/22/2024 07:06 PM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interest for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/22/2024 by email. [1049482] [25-1179] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 6 ] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/22/2024 07:05 PM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 3 Docketing Statement for the Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/22/2024 by email. [1049481] [25-1179] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/22/2024 07:04 PM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance for Mark F. (Thor) Hearne, II as counsel for Appellants James Achille, Jonathan Achille, John Buenaventura Baez, Deborah E. Barron, Courtyard Villas, L.L.C., Sharon Krueger, Alta Martin, Willis Martin, James Musselwhite, James Myers, Katherine Myers, Ronald Nourse, Old Forest Lakes Owners Association, Gilda Pascual, June Shumway, Stephen Stiller, The ALB Revocable Trust, The Mallon Family Trust, The RPB Revocable Trust, Anna Mary Weaver, Enos Weaver, Jr. and Christopher Wormwood. Service: 11/22/2024 by email. [1049480] [25-1179] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 6 ] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 6 ] [Mark Hearne] [Entered: 11/22/2024 07:02 PM]
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 11/08/2024. [1047163] Entry of Appearance due 12/02/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/02/2024. Docketing Statement due 12/16/2024. Appellant's brief is due 01/13/2025. [GWK] [Entered: 11/14/2024 04:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Barron v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE MYERS
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE RPB REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER WORMWOOD
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MUSSELWHITE
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA MARY WEAVER
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROMAN P. BOSWELL, Trustee of the RPB Revocable Trust, dated August 31, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENOS WEAVER, JR.
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH E. BARRON
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD NOURSE
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRINE L. BOSWELL, Trustee of the ALB Revocable Trust, dated July 21, 2003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN ACHILLE
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN STILLER
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ALB REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACEK GATKIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MYERS
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLD FOREST LAKES OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON KRUEGER
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE SHUMWAY
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BUENAVENTURA BAEZ
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA MARTIN
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILDA PASCUAL
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTYARD VILLAS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MALLON FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ACHILLE
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS MARTIN
Represented By: Mark F. Hearne II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNA GATKIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAPAULA V. LESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. MALLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE A. MALLON, as Trustees of the Mallon Family Trust under agreement dated October 3, 2007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Kyle Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?