Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S. v. United States
Plaintiff: Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.
Defendant: United States
Not Yet Classified: Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation and Steel Dynamics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00149
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of International Trade
Presiding Judge: Gary S Katzmann
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 19 Administrative record for U.S. Department of Commerce filed . Filed by William Mitchell Purdy of U.S. Department of Commerce on behalf of United States. (Attachments: #1 Public Record Index, #2 BPI Record Index, #3 Declaration, #4 Final FR, #5 Final Results)(Purdy, William)
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 Form 11 Notice of Appearance . Filed by William Mitchell Purdy of U.S. Department of Commerce on behalf of United States.(Purdy, William)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order entered on 6/1/2022 granting Consent Motion to intervene as defendant-intervenors. ORDERED that RTAC and its individual members' consent motion to intervene is granted, and it is further ORDERED that RTAC and its individual members be entered as defendant-intervenors in the above-captioned action (Related Doc #13 ). (Goell, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2022 Filing 16 Form 17 Business Proprietary Information Certification filed on behalf of Alan H. Price, John R. Shane, Maureen E. Thorson, and Stephanie M. Bell as Attorney/Consultant(s) . Filed by Alan Hayden Price of Wiley Rein, LLP on behalf of Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation, Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Steel Dynamics, Inc.. (Price, Alan)
June 1, 2022 Filing 15 Form 11 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Alan H. Price, John R. Shane, Maureen E. Thorson, and Stephanie M. Bell. Filed by Alan Hayden Price of Wiley Rein, LLP on behalf of Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation, Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Steel Dynamics, Inc..(Price, Alan)
June 1, 2022 Filing 14 Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Alan Hayden Price of Wiley Rein, LLP on behalf of Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation, Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Steel Dynamics, Inc.. (Price, Alan)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 Consent Motion to Intervene as Defendant-Intervenor on behalf of Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation, and Steel Dynamics, Inc.. Responses due by 6/22/2022. Filed by Alan Hayden Price of Wiley Rein, LLP on behalf of Rebar Trade Action Coalition, Byer Steel Group, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc., Nucor Corporation, Steel Dynamics, Inc..(Price, Alan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order entered on 5/26/2022 assigning action to Judge Gary S. Katzmann. (Goell, Geoffrey)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 Form 11 Notice of Appearance . Filed by Kelly M. Geddes of U.S. Department of Justice on behalf of United States.(Geddes, Kelly)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order entered on 5/17/2022 Form 24 Order for Statutory Injunction Upon Consent Granted. (Goell, Geoffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 Form 24 Proposed Order for Statutory Injunction Upon Consent . Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 8 Summons served by Clerk's Office upon Plaintiff and appropriate Government Agency/Agencies . (Chien, Jason)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of service (related document(s) #6 , #5 , #4 , #2 , #1 , #3 ). Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Complaint against United States. Administrative Record due by 6/21/2022. Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S..(Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 Form 17 Business Proprietary Information Certification filed on behalf of Andrew T. Schutz, Kavita Mohan, Michael S. Holton, Jordan C. Kahn as Attorney/Consultant(s) . Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Form 11 Notice of Appearance for Andrew T. Schutz, Kavita Mohan, Michael S. Holton, Jordan C. Kahn. Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S..(Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 Form 5 Information Statement . Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 Summons . Filed by Andrew Thomas Schutz of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.. (Schutz, Andrew)

Search for this case: Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S. v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaptan Demir Celik Endustrisi ve Ticaret A.S.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Schutz
Represented By: Jordan Charles Kahn
Represented By: Kavita Mohan
Represented By: Michael Scott Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Attorney-in-Charge
Represented By: Kelly M. Geddes
Represented By: William Mitchell Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Rebar Trade Action Coalition
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Byer Steel Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Commercial Metals Company
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Steel Dynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Hayden Price
Represented By: John R. Shane
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: Stephanie Manaker Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?