Josam Industries, LLC v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Josam Industries, LLC
Defendant: United States, Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Trade Representative, Office of the United States Trade Representative and United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2024cv00154
Filed: August 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of International Trade
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 Filing 11 Notice from the Court Administrative Order 21-04, addressing the extension of the Defendants' stipulation to unassigned Section 301 Cases, has been posted to the court's website: https://www.cit.uscourts.gov/uscit-rules-forms-chambers-procedures-guidelines-and-administrative-orders. (Warner, Scott)
August 21, 2024 Filing 10 Notice from the Court Administrative Order 21-03, addressing the extension of the preliminary injunction to unassigned Section 301 Cases, has been posted to the court's website: https://www.cit.uscourts.gov/uscit-rules-forms-chambers-procedures-guidelines-and-administrative-orders. (Warner, Scott)
August 21, 2024 Filing 9 Pursuant to Administrative Order 21-02, this case is stayed. See https://www.cit.uscourts.gov/uscit-rules-forms-chambers-procedures-guidelines-and-administrative-orders.(Warner, Scott)
August 20, 2024 Filing 8 Amended Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement deemed filed. Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Almonte, Giselle)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order entered on 8/20/2024 granting Consent Motion for errata as to Form 13 (Related Doc #6 ). (Almonte, Giselle)
August 19, 2024 Filing 6 Consent Motion for errata to correct Form 13 document number# 4 filed with the Court electronically on 8/15/2024 (related document(s) #4 ). Responses due by 9/9/2024. Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Spraragen, Joseph)
August 19, 2024 Filing 5 [***NOTE: THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN SUPERSEDED BY DOC #8 ***] Amended Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Spraragen, Joseph) Modified on 8/20/2024 (Almonte, Giselle).
August 15, 2024 Filing 4 [***NOTE: THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN SUPERSEDED BY DOC #8 ***] Form 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Spraragen, Joseph) Modified on 8/20/2024 (Almonte, Giselle).
August 15, 2024 Filing 3 Form 5 Information Statement . Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Spraragen, Joseph)
August 15, 2024 Filing 2 Complaint against All Defendants. Answer due by 10/15/2024. Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC.(Spraragen, Joseph)
August 15, 2024 Filing 1 Summons . Filed by Joseph Martin Spraragen of Grunfeld Desiderio Lebowitz Silverman & Klestadt, LLP on behalf of Josam Industries, LLC. (Spraragen, Joseph)

Search for this case: Josam Industries, LLC v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josam Industries, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Martin Spraragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Attorney-in-Charge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Trade Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the United States Trade Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?