Barr, et al v. Qwest Comm Intl Inc, et al
Case Number: 1:2001cv00748
Filed: April 23, 2001
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER striking 166 Motion of Susman Group Pursuant to Order of Court Dated February 25, 2013 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/13/13.(jjhsl, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FEE-AND-EXPENSE AWARD FROM ESCROW granting 164 Consent Motion. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/25/13.(mjgsl, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Allowing Non-Compliant Exclusion Requests and Confirming All Exclusions by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/11/13. (jjhsl, )
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness Hearing held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/19/2012. Granting 155 Motion to Allow Non-compliant Exclusion Requests and to Provide Notice of All Exclusion Requests. Granting 149 Motion for Final Approval of Class-Action Settlement and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Parties shall meet and confer and submit the required forms of order by 1/7/2013, including a reference in a pleading that the parties have met and conferred and are satisfied that the language in the proposed deed is complete and accurate. Settlement is approved by the Court. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (eseam)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Certifying Settlement Class, Preliminarily Approving Class-Action Settlement, and Approving Form and Manner of Notice by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/20/12. (jjhsl, )
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER granting 140 Motion for an Order Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint. ORDERED that the Answer Deadlines currently pending are VACATED and shall be reset, if necessary, after resolution of the Joint Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Preliminary Approval of Class-Action Settlement, and Approval of Form and Manner of Notice 138 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/19/12.(jjhsl, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER granting 117 Motion to Amend Statewide Class Action Complaint. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall accept Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Statewide Class Action Complaint [117-2] for filing as of the date of this Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/05/12.(jjhsl, )
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting 112 Motion to Amend Second Amended Statewide Class Action Complaint. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall accept Plaintiffs' Third Amended Statewide Class Action Complaint [#112-1] for filing as of the date of this Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/23/12.(jjhsl, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case for Purposes of Settlement 109 is GRANTED. This matter shall be reopened for the limited purpose of settlement. Should the parties wish to proceed on any aspect of the case other than settlement, leave must be granted by the Court. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/21/2011.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr, et al v. Qwest Comm Intl Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?