Anderson, et al v. Moen, et al
Plaintiff: David Ray Anderson
Defendant: Craig Moen, Jessie Avendano, Kenneth Manzanares and Ryan Grothe
Case Number: 1:2002cv01126
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 197 Notice of Appeal by David Anderson, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/30/10. Appellant has 30 days to file a proper 1915 motion and have the trust fund account statement certified by a prison official. (bjrsl, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER of Dismissal Under Rule 41(b). This civil action is dismissed under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/10. (gmssl, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER for Status Report to be filed by counsel by 8/13/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/3/2010. (rpmcd)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Discharging 173 Order to Show Cause and Setting Status Conference for 3/26/2010 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/1/2010. (rpmcd)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER For Status Report by counsel due 2/10/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/27/2010. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, et al v. Moen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ray Anderson
Represented By: Christopher P. Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Moen
Represented By: David J. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Avendano
Represented By: David J. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Manzanares
Represented By: David J. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Grothe
Represented By: David J. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?