FDIC v. St. Paul Companies, et al
Case Number: 1:2003cv00115
Filed: January 17, 2003
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821 Default of Loan by Promissary Note
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Each party to pay its own fees and costs, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/03/09. (wjc, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 120 Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2009. (mehcd)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Trial Procedures ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference for 6/23/2009 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due on or before 06/16/09. Bench Trial set for 7/8/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/09/09. (wjc, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 102 MOTION for In Camera Inspection and Access to Grand Jury Materials with prejudice, with leave to file a miscellaneous action in this District seeking the release of the grand jury materials, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/23/09. (wjc, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re: 106 Order is held in abeyance pending the briefing and adjudication of the matters raised in Defendants' Motion for Access to Grand Jury Materials until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/21/09. (wjc, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER Granting 102 Defendants' MOTION for Access to Grand Jury Materials. Any supplemental statement re: Court's proposed use of a special master due on or before 1/23/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/16/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FDIC v. St. Paul Companies, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?