USA v. Dawursk, et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ronald R. Dawursk, Marianne Wilson and Judith A. Dawursk
Case Number: 1:2003cv00908
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Confirming Sale of the Residence and Directing Distribution of Sale Proceeds as set forth in this Order by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/22/09. (jjh, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Denying 137 Emergency Motion for Bill of Review and Request for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/12/2009.(rpmcd)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER striking 133 Motion by the Third-Party Interpleader as Plaintiff for Stay of Execution of Judgment to Allow the Court Sufficient Time to Consider the Merit of the Third-Party Interpleader and Petitioner by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/30/09.(jjh, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER of Foreclosure and Decree of Sale of the Residence Re: 129 Motion for Order (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/8/2009.(rpmcd)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER for Additional Service by Mail. Ordered that additional service be made by mailing the Court's Findings and Conclusions and Order to Show Cause Why Default Judgment Should Not Enter 01/22/08 83 mailed out to the addresses indicated in this Order. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/08/08. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Dawursk, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Guy Patrick Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald R. Dawursk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Dawursk
Represented By: Gregory J. Hock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?