Sytsema v. Academy School District No. 20
Case Number: 1:2003cv02582
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: O Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: O

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re: Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, With Prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/10/10.(jjh, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER for Entry of Judgment for Plaintiffs. Ordered that judgment will enter for the Plaintiffs in the amount of $38,503.45 to reimburse them for their costs and expenses for the education of Nicholas Sytsema during the 2001-02 school year. Orde red that Plaintiffs shall recover their costs upon filing of a bill of costs within 10 days. The Plaintiffs shall submit their request for attorneys fees for this claim in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/09. (jjh, )
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER for Status Report. Parties shall file a status report by 2/13/2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/3/2008. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sytsema v. Academy School District No. 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?