Wilkerson, et al v. Schirmer Eng Corp, et al
Case Number: 1:2004cv00258
Filed: February 11, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/8/10. (ebs, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER re: 204 Motion to Vacate. The 12/9/09 Status Conference is vacated on the understanding that the parties will schedule a Settlement Conference next week with Magistrate Judge Hegarty, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 12/9/09.(ebs, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims, with the exception of the reinstatement claim for which Plaintiff Gail J. Wilkerson remains the real party in interest, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/28/09. (ebs, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation 188 . 184 Bankruptcy Trustee's Motion to Intervene is granted in part with respect to intervening for monetary claims and denied in part with respect to substitution as the real party in interest for the reinstatement claim. Plaintiff remains the real part in interest with respsect to the reinstaement claim. Granting in part and denying in part 196 Bankruptcy Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. Bankruptcy Trustee has to 9/18/09 to withdraw it s motion to voluntarily dismiss. If not withdrawn by that date, the case shall be dismissed prejudice as to all claims except the reinstatement claim, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/26/09.(gms, ) Modified on 8/31/2009 to correct typographical errors (gms, ).
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 184 MOTION to Intervene filed by Bankruptcy Trustee, David E. Lewis, be granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/17/09. (ebs, )
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Minute ORDER striking 182 Bankruptcy Trustee's Motion to Intervene, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/2/09.(gmssl, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 176 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Extend Deadline to Reopen; granting 179 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen. Bankruptcy trustee has to 2/27/09 to move to intervene, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/28/09.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson, et al v. Schirmer Eng Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?