Kaufman v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2005cv02311
Filed: November 15, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 JUDGMENT by Clerk re 362 : judgment is entered for Katherine Kaufman and against Sean Chase. Sean Chase shall pay Katherine Kaufman the sum of $2,500.00 as attorney's fees, by Deputy Clerk on 3/14/2014. (rpmcd)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER For Hearing re 352 , 323 , and 334 : a hearing will be held at a time to be set after conferring with counsel to hear and determine the amount of the attorneys' fees to be awarded to Katharine Kaufman pursuant Judge Miller's order of November 19, 2008. No non-party attorney fee affidavit or expert testimony is required for this hearing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/7/2014. (rpmcd)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MINUTE ORDER granting 346 Motion to Withdraw, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/22/10.(ebs, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MINUTE ORDER granting 334 Plaintiff counsels motion to file reply to objection to attorneys fees; granting 323 Plaintiff's Motion to waive non-party attorney fee affidavit by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/15/09.(erv, )
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER denying 322 Plaintiffs Motion Under F.R.C.P. 60(b)(3), 60(b)(6) and 59(e) for Relief From, or to Alter, Judgment Dated November 19, 2008 by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/3/09.(erv, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER denying 154 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Order Regarding Summary Judgment RE: Fraud Claim. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 02/01/2008.(sah2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?