Trout v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2006cv00236
Filed: February 10, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 120 is APPROVED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/30/2010. (sah, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER. The unopposed Motion to Withdraw filed by Jeremy Sitcoff 103 is GRANTED. Mr. Sitcoffs representation of Plaintiff is hereby terminated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/03/2010.(sah, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 83 Motion to Vacate and Reset Final Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/18/2010. (mehcd)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 the Stipulated Joint Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference and Final Pretrial Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2009 is VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2009 is VACATED and RESET to 2/10/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/3/2009. (mehcd)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Counsel shall conference together and call chambers at (303)844-4507 on or before 9/15/2009 to reset the conference. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/8/2009. (mehcd)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Seven (7) Day Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/19/2009. (sah, )
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter.Entered by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter on 2/14/06. (pap, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trout v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?