Howard v. Waide et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv00282
Filed: February 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Granting 291 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/7/10.(ebs, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 261 Motion for Leave. Defendants shall have through and including July 31, 2010 to complete the depositions of the six persons confined in prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/20/10.(cbssec)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: Eight-Day Jury Trial set for 12/6/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/19/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/23/10. (ebs, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 183 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. ORDERED that discovery is due by 9/15/2009 and dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 10/15/2009. No further extensions will be granted. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/22/09.(cbssec)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER granting 180 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order with Respect to Expert Deadlines. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(2) Affirmative expert disclosures is extended to and including 6/22/09. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(2) Re buttal expert disclosures is extended to and including 7/22/09. Discovery deadline extended to 8/17/2009 for the sole purpose of conducting depositions of experts, all other discovery must be completed by the July 30th deadline, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/28/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Waide et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?