Pure Research Products, L.L.C. v. Allergy Research Group, Inc. et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv00381
Filed: March 3, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Phillip S. Figa
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER CORRECTING ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S POST-VERDICT MOTIONS re: 158 Order, (the last sentence of the first paragraph on page 4 is corrected), signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/17/2009. (rpmcd)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs Post-Verdict Motions. Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Damages under 11 U.S.C. § 1117(a): Defendant's Profits 148 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief 149 and Plaintiff's Motion f or Determination of Defendant's Liability for Award of Plaintiff's Attorneys Fees under 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a) are denied and that final judgment will enter denying the plaintiff all relief and dismissing this civil action by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/15/09.(jjh, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Second Pretrial Conference held on 9/29/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute or Join Party-Defendants or in the Alternative for Leave to Take Limited Discovery, filed December 8, 2008 105 , is moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence: Comparative Product Efficacy, filed 9/24/2009 119 , is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence: Unlawful Trademark Use - FDALabeling Requirements, filed 9/24/ 2009 120 , is denied. Joint Statement of the Case, plaintiff's additional proposed jury instructions and final lists of witnesses (order to be called and estimated examination time) to be faxed to Court's chambers by 4:00 p.m. October 1, 2009. Trial briefs to shall be filed by 4:00 p.m. October 2, 2009. Counsel shall prepare a glossary of technical terms for court recorder. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER to Submit Proposed Jury Instructions and Voir Dire Questions. Counsel to submit by facsimile transmission their respective proposed jury instructions, exclusive of stock instructions, and proposed voir dire questions by 3:00 p.m. Monday 9/28/09, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/25/09. (gms, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Setting Second Pretrial Conference for 9/29/2009 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed pretrial order due by 4:00 p.m. 9/24/2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2009. (rpmcd)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Setting Jury Trial Date for 10/5/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/26/2009. (rpmcd)
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2006 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 03/17/06. (rlp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Research Products, L.L.C. v. Allergy Research Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?