JP Enterprises, Inc. v. HDVE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2006cv01046
Filed: June 2, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER of Dismissal. Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice is approved. Action is dismissed with prejudice, parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Trial Preparation Conference set 12/14/07 and trial set 12/17/07 are vacated. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/26/06. (gms, )
December 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER of DISMISSAL as to Dft Yahoo, The matter comes before the court sua sponte on the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 30, filed December 12, 2006. The court entered an order dismissing the case 31, on December 13, 2006. After ca reful review of the stipulation and the file, the court has concluded that the stipulation should be approved and that only plaintiff's claims against defendant Yahoo, Inc., should be dismissed with prejudice.Inc, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED as fol lows: That the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 30, filed December 12, 2006 is APPROVED. That plaintiff's claims against defendant Yahoo, Inc. IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs; That d efendant Yahoo, Inc. is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly; and That this order supplants and supersedes the Order of Dismissal 31 entered December 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/06. (erv, )
June 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT INSIGHT DIRECT USA, INC. re: 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Insight Direct USA, Inc. with prejudice, each party to pay own costs/fees. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/14/06. (dln, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Enterprises, Inc. v. HDVE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?