Escobar v. Reid et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01222
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 340 Notice of Appeal by Jose Medina Escobar, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/14/11. (bjrsl, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER Denying as moot 332 Motion to Amend Final Pretrial Order; Denying as moot 336 Motion for Order for Review of: Trial Material, and Request for Subpoena; The three-day jury trial is set to commence on September 6, 2011 is VACATED; This case is DISMISSED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/22/2011.(erv, )
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MINUTE ORDER denying 333 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Defense Counsel to Produce All Documents Produced Through Discovery for Plaintiffs Review. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/13/2011.(erv, )
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER THAT Defendants shall submit further briefing and documentary evidence concerning whether Plaintiff has exhausted his admin-istrative remedies with respect to the remaining claims by no later than close of business on June 7, 2011. To the exten t that Plaintiff has failed to exhaust his administrative remedies, Defendants shall also address whether such failure was procured from the action or inaction of prison officials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants briefing within fourteen days of service. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/25/2011. (erv, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting in part 313 Plaintiffs Motion to Suppress Deposition Taken March 30, 2011 for Unethical Conduct to the extent that it requests an order placing Plaintiff on the list of parties for which the Court is seeking volunteer counsel and DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall place Plaintiff on the list of parties for which the Court is seeking volunteer counsel. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/20/2011.(erv, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER Denying 310 Motion to Recuse Magistrate and Trial Judge. Plaintiff's filing of any further pleadings that contain disrespectful, baseless, and outlandish allegations against the judiciary will be stricken from the record, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/13/11.(lsw, )
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 300 Plaintiffs Motion to Submit Further Documentation in Support of Plaintiffs Confiscated Legal Property and Pens, etc. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2011.(erv, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 276 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, denying 294 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; denying 265 Motion for TRO; denying 265 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/9/2011.The January 31, 2011 Minute Order issued by Magistrate Judge Mix 291 , is AFFIRMED.(erv, )
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MINUTE ORDER granting 288 Plaintiffs Motion for Court to Furnish Plaintiff with All Legal Pleadings, Orders, etc. Returned to the Court Since December 23, 2010 by this Facility; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of the Order an d Recommendation 276 to Plaintiff. Denying 289 Motion for Order new packet of § 1983 forms to start over my civil rights complaint and to amend my recently submitted complain. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the case manager for Plaintiff at the Centennial Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 600, Canon City, CO 81215-0600. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/31/2011.(erv, )
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Dismissing Parties and Amending Caption re: 274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations, J. Sims, J. Brown and E. Diclusion are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/13/2011. (erv, )
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff's case manager, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/11. (mnf, )
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED re 249 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. granting 246 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs First Claim against Defendants James Brown, Joseph Sims, and Eric D eclusion for Eighth Amendment violations arising from a January 17, 2004 incident is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs Sixth Claim against Defendant Duane Raymond for Eighth Amendment violations arising from a July 2, 2006 incident is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/16/2010.(erv, )
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTE ORDER denying 258 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Ruling by Trial Judge Christine M. Arguello. the Motion is actually a renewed motion for the appointment of counsel. Plaintiff seeks counsel or to be included on the Clerk of the Courts list of pro se cases for which the court is seeking volunteer counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/23/2010.(erv, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying 230 Motion for Order for Discovery; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 237 Motion for Order for Examination. Defendants shall provide access to a physician designated by Plaintiff pursuant to CDOC Administrative Regulation 700-21. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs motion to provide a physician at court expense. Plaintiff must both locate and pay for any physician to conduct an independent medical examination for the purpose of providing expert testimony in support of Plaintiffs claims. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/24/2010.(erv, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER denying as moot 221 Plaintiffs Motion to Subpoena Defendant Gonzales at Court Expense. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/29/2009.(sah, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 216 Motion to Amend Supplemental Complaint by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/09.(erv, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 209 Report and Recommendations of United StatesMagistrate Judge. Granting in part and Denying in part 176 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 178 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 179 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/17/09.(erv, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 179 MOTION to Dismiss Judgment on the Pleadings filed by C/O Raymond, Santos, D. Smith, Williams, Paulino, Ball, John Dow, be GRANTED; 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by E. Mora, Craney, Woolfolk, L. Montoya , Miklich, E. Cella, A. Luna, J. Brown, Jackson, E. Diclusion, D. Smith, Santos, D. Gallagher, Valdez, Williams, L. Reid, Ball, Lt. Mathews, T. Haucks, J. Sims, C/O Raymond, R. Olivett, Paulino, Binder, John Dow, Colton, R. Wencl, J. Wermers, Nurse Rita, K. Cooper, be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C/O Raymond, be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/09. (erv, )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. Signed by Judge Edward W. Nottingham on 7/30/07. (pap, )
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Reinstating and Drawing Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Ordered that this civil action is reinstated pursuant to the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit filed in this action on July 11, 2007. Further Ordered that the action shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 7/19/2007. (llr, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER Denying 27 Plaintiff's MOTION to Introduce Relevant Information in Support of Supplemental Complaint, TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 7/11/07.(pap, )
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file 1915 motion with certified copy of trust fund statement. re: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/26/06. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Reid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?