Loya et al v. Ortiz et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01259
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS IT IS ORDERED that, within 30 days after judgment is entered, counsel for the partiesshall obtain from the Court any exhibits and depositions used during this case. Counsel shallretain same for 60 d ays beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of all appellateproceedings. Failure to retrieve the exhibits and depositions in this matter in conformance withthis Order may result in their destruction.. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/12/06. (erv, )
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Vacate 7/18/06 Hearing. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/11/06. (erv, )
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing, Reset Hearings: In Court Hearing Reset for 7/18/2006 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/7/06. (erv, )
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Respondents shall, file a Response on or before 7/11/06 < filed by Benito Loya, DENYING Motion for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, Set Hearings:Non-Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/12/2006 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/30/06. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loya et al v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?