Microsoft Corporation v. Microcomp Solution, Inc. et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01365
Filed: July 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Phillip S. Figa
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Cross-ClaimAdding a Party, signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 08/02/06. (rlp, )
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2006 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 08/01/06. (rlp, )
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal. Clerk to randomly reassign case to another judge. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/20/06. (gms, )
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Recusal. Case to be returned to Clerk for reassignment by random draw. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/18/06. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Microcomp Solution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?