Schwab v. Kids' Financial Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv01793
Filed: September 11, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 149 Stipulated Motion for Release of Funds From Registry, Motion to Vacate Order Awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs and Motion to Withdraw Request for Supplemental Award of Attorney Fees. Payment shall be made to plaintiff Hope Schwab from the Court Registry in the amount of $4,177.87, plus interest, less the registry fee assessment. The Order 118 is vacated to the extent that it awards plaintiff costs in the amount of $375.00 and attorney fees in the amount of $40,415.00. Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs 120 is deemed withdrawn, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/12/10.(ebs, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Motion Hearing held on 12/29/2009. Plaintiffs oral Motion to Withdraw Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Subpoena Duces Tecum is granted; granting in part and denying without pr ejudice in part 125 Defendants Unopposed Motion Requesting Permission to Deposit Money with the Registry of the Court; denying as moot 126 Judgment Creditors Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause; denying as moot 129 Defendants Motion to Q uash Subpoena; denying as moot 132 Judgment Creditors Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause; Defendant shall pay $4,177.87 into the Registry of the Court on or before December 31, 2009; Defendant shall file Supersedeas Bond and a Motion to Approve Bond in this Court on or before January 8, 2010; All post-judgment discovery is STAYED until ruling on the Motion to Approve Supersedeas Bond. (Court Reporter FTR - Kathleen Finney) (klmcd)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry of Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2009 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. 97 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $375.00 in costs and $40,415.00 in attorney fees. 109 Motion for Protective Order is denied as moot. Plaintiff may file supplemental motion regarding post trial costs if the issue is unable to be resolved by October 1, 2009. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd) Modified on 9/21/2009 to correct typographical error (ebs, ).
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 98 Defendant Kids' Financial, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/12/09.(ebs, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $4,177.87 in punitive damages. Plaintiff is awarded costs and reasonable attorney's fees as determined by the Court, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/6/09. (gms, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall retain custody of the exhibits until such time as any need for the exhibits has terminated and the time to appeal has expired or all appellate proceedings have been terminated plus sixty days, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/04/09. (wjc, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 02/07/08.(jmp, )
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS IT IS ORDERED that, within 30 days after judgment is entered, counsel for the parties shall obtain from the Court any exhibits and depositions used during this case. Counsel shallretain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of all appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve the exhibits and depositions in this matter in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/13/06. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab v. Kids' Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?