Murphy v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01948
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or to file a 1915 moion re 212 Notice of Appeal, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/2/09. (gmssl, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER. The defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 56 163 filed 02/23/2009, is GRANTED. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the plaintiffs putative equal protection claim is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), any claims the plaintiff may intend to assert against the Colorado Department of Corrections (CDOC) are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. JU DGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, the Colorado Department of Corrections, Peggy Heil, Paul Hollenbeck, Don Morton, Larry Turner, and Michael Leewaye, against the plaintiff, Daniel E. Murphy. Defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. This case is DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/10/2009.(sah, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 170 filed 03/06/2009, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The plaintiffs objections 175 , filed 03/16/2009, are OVERRRULED. The Motion for Leave To Add Additional Constitutional Violation 156 filed 02/03/2009, is DENIED. The Motion for Leave To Amend the Complaint 160 filed 02/17/2009, is DENIED. The Plaintiffs Second Request for Evidentiary Hearing 167 filed 03/02/2009, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/02/2009.(sah, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying 184 Motion to Compel; denying 185 Motion for Hearing/Conference; and denying 188 Motion to Enforce. The plaintiff shall cease filing redundant motions. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/08/2009.(sah, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER. The Defendants Motion 178 is GRANTED. The plaintiffs response 176 and supplemental response 177 are STRICKEN. The plaintiff shall, on or before 05/21/2009, submit a response to the defendants summary judgment motion which does not exceed 20 pages in length, excluding attachments. The Plaintiffs Motion 182 is DENIED by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/22/2009.(sah, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE ORDER denying 171 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Procedures by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/11/2009.(sah, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: that 156 Motion for Leave to Add Additional Constitutional Violation, 160 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint, 167 Plaintiffs Second Request for Evidentiary Hearing BE DENIED by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/06/2009. (sah, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file 1915 motion with certified copy of trust fund statement. re: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/26/06. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?