Health Grades, Inc. v. Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital
Case Number: 1:2006cv02351
Filed: November 22, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Defendants, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this injunctive order through personal service or otherwise, are hereby permanently restrained and enjoined from activley engaging in any of the acts: see order for details. Should either or both Defendants be found to have violated this Order, the responsible Defendant shall pay Health Grades liquidated damages in the amount of $150,000 for each instance in which this Order was violated by the Defendant. Health Grades also shall be entitled to recover from the responsible Defendant the attorney's fees, expert witness fees and costs it incurred in recovering such liquidated damages, if any. This Order is a permanent Order of the Court that may be enforced through the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including but not limited to contempt proceedings, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/06/2009. (wjc, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. Defendant's Answer is due on or before 09/17/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/20/09.(wjc, )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS: Robert Wood Johnson University Hospitals 10 Motion to Dismiss Health Grades copyright and trademark infringement claims is denied. RWJs 10 Motion to Dismiss Health Grades breach of contract claim is granted in part and denied in part as described in Order. Health Grades 16 Rule 56 Motion in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot, by Judge John L. Kane on 06/19/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Grades, Inc. v. Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?