Ackerman v. Keith et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv02384
Filed: November 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER denying 174 Motion for Waiver of Fees, Fines, and Costs, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2016.(slibi, )
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 167 Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs. Defendants may have their costs upon compliance with Local Rule 54.1, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/16/10.(ebs, )
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER granting 168 Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Clarification. The electronic signature located on the 3/22/2010 order is valid, pursuant to D.C. Colo LCivR 5.6A. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/22/2010. (mehcd)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: Plaintiff Edwin Mark Ackerman's objections 106 to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge are overruled. Denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 98 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiff, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/22/10.(ebs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER denying 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Show When and How the Defendants Placed the Plaintiff into Segregation, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/2/2010. (mehcd)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion to Open and Extend the Discovery Period. Denying as moot 150 Plaintiff's Motion to Compell [sic]. Denying as moot 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Denying as moot 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Denying as moot 153 Plaintiff's Request for Order Granting Depositions and Interrogatories, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/11/10.(ebs, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's following motions: 143 Motion to Compell [sic] the Defendants to Produce Records as to their Justification for Placing Plaintiff in Segregation; 144 Motion for Extension of Time; 145 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; 146 Request for Order Granting Depositions and Interrogatories. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/17/2009. (mehcd) Modified on 12/18/2009 to correct typographical error (ebs, ).
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Settlement. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2009. (mehcd)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to make monthly filing fee payment or to show cause by 2/16/09 and by the 15th day of each month thereafter re: 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/29/09. (pap, )
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Amend Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/14/06. (pap, )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 on the court's current and proper fo rm and to include a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement that is certified by a prison official. Plaintiff has 30 days to file his Prisoner Complaint matching the names in the caption to the names in the text. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/28/2006. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerman v. Keith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?