v. Nguyen et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv02503
Filed: December 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 30 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice, each side to pay their own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 01/28/2010.(wjc, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Celina Benavidez in Her Official Capacity with Prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against Ms. Benavidez in her official capacity are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice, each side to pay their own costs and attorney fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/22/2009.(wjc, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on Summary Judgment and Referring Case for Settlement: Granting in part and denying in part 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment shall enter against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant on Plaintiffs Title VII hos tile work environment and gender-based discrimination and retaliation claims. Plaintiffs remaining claims for race and national origin-based discrimination and retaliation under Title VII are referred to Magistrate Judge Watanabe for settlement, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/21/09.(ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Nguyen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?