In re: American Family Mutual Insurance Co. Overtime Pay Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Robert Schultz, Rocky Baldozier, Eric Stack, Robert Reynolds and Jok Nicholson
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2006cv17430
Filed: February 24, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203 Equal Pay Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Granting 421 MOTION for Order to Grant Partial Reimbursement of Costs to Class Counsel and Payment of $500 Each to the 48 Collective Action Members Deposed filed by Jok Nicholson, Eric Stack, Robert Reynolds, Rocky Baldozier, Granting [4 19] Joint MOTION for Order to Grant Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement and Dismiss Case filed by Jok Nicholson, Eric Stack, Robert Reynolds, Rocky Baldozier by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/14/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Document Final Judgment Exh 5, # 6 Exhibit A, to Final Judgment # 7 Proposed Document Final Judgment Exh 6, # 8 Exhibit A)(erv, )
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Minute Entry for Oral Argument Hearing proceedings held on 12/10/2010 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Granting 419 Motion for Order; granting 421 Motion for Order. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting 417 the parties Joint Motion for Order Regarding Re-Mailing of Notice to Certain Class Members by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/2010.(erv, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting 414 Joint Motion for Preliminay Approval of Colective Action Settlement. The Court will hold a hearing on whether to grant final approval to the Settlement. Hearing set for 12/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(erv, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER. The Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Settlement Approval process 405 is GRANTED. On or before 09/03/2010, the Parties shall submit to the Court (a) the proposed settlement; (b) a motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement; and (c) a proposed notice to be mailed to Collective Action Members informing them of the terms of the Settlement. This collective action shall be STAYED pending the completion of the settlement-approval process with respect to all matters other than the settlement-approval process. By Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/04/2010. (sah, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 391 Notice of Appeal by Martin Lukes and Jonathan Riches, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/06/10. Appellant's have 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER: The Motion to Enforce Consent Decree Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs under Rule 24(A), 24(B), doc # 387 is DENIED. The court requests the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to each of the Movants Landon Donovan, Kyle Farnsworth, Jonathan Lee Riches, Abe Pollin, Umar Farouk Abdulmutallab, Colin Firth, and Martin Lukes at FMC Lexington, P.O. Box 14500, Lexington, KY 40512 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/24/2010.(cbscd)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 375 Michelle Cottinghams Motion to Withdraw Her Opt In to Schultz v.American Family by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/3/2010.(erv, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY as to Schultz opt-ins Enrique Farfan, Rocky Fenner, David Melendez, Paige Yearick, and Marcia Myrvik. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/1/10. (cbssec)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting 365 Plaintiff Oscar Cotas request to Withdraw his Consent to Join ; granting 366 Plaintiff Daniel Dennes request to Withdraw his Consent to Join. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/14/09.(erv, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting 132 American Familys Motion to Dismiss Baldozier Plaintiffs Rule 23 State Law Claims; Denying as moot 140 Baldozier Plaintiffs Motion to Certify State Law Classes; and the Baldozier Plaintiffs Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth claim s for relief in its First Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Denying as Moot 151 Plaintiff Robert Schultzs Motion to Certify an Illinois State Law Class; and Schultzs Second Claim for Relief, based on Illinois State law, is DISMISSE D WITHOUT PREJUDICE. granting 178 American Familys Motion to Dismiss Schultz Rule 23 State Law Claims; Denying as moot 290 American Familys Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Response Opposing the Baldozier and Schultz Motions for Rule 23 Certification of State Law Classes by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/28/09.(erv, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: taking under advisement 323 Motion to Certify Class; Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2009. (Court Reporter Therese Lindblom.) (wydcd, rrk)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 262 American Family Mutual Insurance Companys Motion to Dismiss; denying 264 American Familys Motion to Dismiss Michelle Cottingham and Paige Yearick (Schultz opt-ins); denying without prejudice 309 American Familys Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims Brought By: (I) Non-Responding Plaintiffs; (ii) Time-Barred Plaintiffs; and (iii) No Overtime Plaintiffs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/27/09.(erv, )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MINUTE ORDER granting 347 Joint Motion to Produce Audatex EstimatingSoftware. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/16/09.(erv, )
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER and Notice of Hearing. granting 141 Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Supplemental Hoffman- La Roche Notice, granting 145 Plaintiff Robert Schultz's Motion for Approval of Supplemental Hoffman- La Roche Notice and re: 152 , 149 Amendments. Hearing on form order and notice/In Court Hearing set for 2/20/2009 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/3/09.(gms, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: taking under advisement 132 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement 140 Motion to Certify Class; taking under advisement 141 Motion to Supplement; taking under advisement 145 Motion ; taking under advisement 151 Motion to Certify Class; taking under advisement 152 Motion to Supplement; Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2008. Supplemental briefings on C.A.F.A. shall be filed not later than Thursday, February 21, 2008. (Court Reporter Kara Spitler.) (erv, )
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Hearing on Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment is converted to a Status Conference set for 3/8/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Counsel for all parties in the combined action shall attend. That on or before 3/6/06, counsel for Plaintiff Robert Schultz and counsel for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company in Schultz v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, 04-cv-05512(N.D. Illinois), s hall file a short status report. The trial set in Baldozier v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, 04-cv-02174(D.Colo), previously set to commence 8/14/06, is vacated. Signed by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/27/06. (lam, ) (Modified on 2/27/2006 to correct typing error) (lam, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: American Family Mutual Insurance Co. Overtime Pay Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schultz
Represented By: Richard B. Wynkoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Baldozier
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stack
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jok Nicholson
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?