Thomas v. Ortiz et al
Petitioner: Mack W. Thomas
Respondent: Joe Ortiz and Colorado Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2007cv00114
Filed: January 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Returning State Court Record, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/3/12. (lygsl, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER. Petitioners Objection to District Courts Order and Denial of Certificate of Appealability in Forma Pauperis 119 is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/10.(ltbcd, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying as moot 107 Plaintiffs Motion to Stay State Court proceedings Pending Appeal of District Courts Order and Judgment. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 03/10/2010.(sah, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. On or before 03/15/2010, the Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court in Boulder County, Colorado, shall provide to this Court the originalwritten record of Boulder County case No. 85 CR 736 - 6/3, People v. Mack Willie Thomas, including the trial and hearing transcripts. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/08/2010. (sah, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 105 Notice of Appeal by Mack Thomas, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/25/10. (bjrsl, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. The Magistrate Judges thorough, comprehensive, and well-reasoned recommendation is correct. The Applicants 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition 3 is DENIED and the above matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/01/2010.(sah, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. It is RECOMMENDED that re 3 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mack W. Thomas BE DENIED, and that this case be dismissed with prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/06/2010. (sah, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. Applicants Objection to the Magistrate Judges Order filed 12/11/2009 98 is DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/05/2010. (sah, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER denying 90 Applicant's Motion to Reconsider Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2009. (mehcd)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER denying 87 Applicant's Petition [Motion] to Stay State Court Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/09.(ebs, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER denying 81 Applicants Request [Motion] for Habeas Corpus Due to Change of Status. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2009.(sah, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER On or before 10/2/2009, the Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court in Boulder County, Colorado, shall provide to this Court the original written record of Boulder County case No. 85 CR 736 - 6/3, People v. Mack Willie Thomas,2 including the February 19 - March 5, 1997 trial transcript, April 23, 1997 sentencing hearing transcript and June 9, 1997 hearing transcript regarding the motion for new trial. It is further requested that, if the Boulder County District Court does not have posses sion of the requested documents and/or transcripts, the Clerk of such court provide to this Court an affidavit reflecting such information. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court by facsimile to (303) 441-4750 and by regular mail to Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court, Boulder Justice Center, P.O. Box 4249, Boulder, CO 80306. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/18/2009. (mehcd)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER denying 73 Applicant's Second Petition [Motion] for Default Judgement with Sactions [sic] and Contempt of Court against Respondents; denying 75 Applicant's Petition to Compel Respondents to Produce for Discovery All Documents Repeatedly Requested by the Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/2009. (mehcd)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER denying 70 Applicants Petition [Motion] for Default Judgement with Sactions [sic] and Contempt of Court against Respondents by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/02/2009.(sah, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. On or before 04/15/2009, the Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court in Boulder County, Colorado, shall provide to this Court the original written record of Boulder County case No. 85 CR 736 - 6/3, People v. Mack Willie Thomas, including all documents filed from July 1997 through April 2003 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/24/2009. (sah, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. On or before 02/20/2009, the Clerk of the 20th Judicial District Court in Boulder County, Colorado, shall provide to this Court the originalwritten record of Boulder County case No. 85 CR 736 - 6/3, People v. Mack Willie Thomas, including all documents filed from February 1997 through April 2003 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/04/2009. (sah, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying 54 Applicants Petition for Summary Judgment, and 58 Applicants Second Petition for Summary Judgment, which the Court construes as requests for expedited disposition of Applicants petition for habeas corpus by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/14/2009.(sah, )
January 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Denying as Premature 4 Applicant's Motion for Production of Documents and Things Pursuant to Rule 34. Denying as Premature 5 Applicant's Motion to Appoint Conflict Free Counsel. Entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/31/07.(pap, )
January 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant has 30 days to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 on the court's current and proper form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/16/2007. (llr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mack W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Ortiz
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado Attorney General
Represented By: Christine Cates Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?