Shire LLC v. Sandoz, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shire LLC
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Sandoz, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Shire LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00197
Filed: January 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0001 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Judgment and ORDER of Permanent Injunction. Defendant is enjoined and estopped during the term of the Patents from making any challenge as to the infringement of the Sandoz Product of each of the Patents, as set forth in the judgment and order. Injunctions to take effect immediately upon entry of this Judgment and Order. Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. re: 196 Motion for Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/4/09.(gmssl, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER Granting in part and taking under advisement in part 196 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case and for Entry of Judgment and Order of Permanent Injunction. Ordered case be reopened, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/28/09.(pap, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER re: 188 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandoz, Inc. The parties having so agreed, it is Ordered that the proceeding is dismissed under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Federal Circuit case no. 2009-1180. (bjrsl, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/30/07. (pap, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire LLC v. Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire LLC
Represented By: Edgar H. Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: James T. Peterka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Ann Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Shire LLC
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?