McInerney v. United Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer McInerney
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00724
Filed: April 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Approving 135 APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING INTEREST, ATTORNEYS FEESAND COSTS, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/14/2011.(rpmcd)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER to Respond to Motions for Award of Attorney's Fees. ORDERED that the defendant now file its response to the plaintiffs motion and supplemental motion for award of attorneys fees on or before July 15, 2011 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/23/11. (jjh, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER deferring ruling Pending Appeal on 108 Motion for Attorney Fees; and 109 Motion for Extension of Time and 117 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/30/09.(bjrsl, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying 100 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; Denying 101 Motion for New Trial and Denying 102 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2009.(rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER for Entry of Judgment. ORDERED that the Clerk will enter judgment for the plaintiff Jennifer McInerney and against defendant United Air Lines in the amount of $389,877.00 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Approving 91 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/6/2009. (rpmcd)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying 76 Motion to Set Schedule for Obtaining Discovery, and Designating Expert Witnesses on Equitable. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/8/2009.(rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McInerney v. United Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McInerney
Represented By: John R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?